This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/06/2021 at 06:09:23 (UTC).

SLF Holdings LLC v. Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 SLF Holdings LLC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3427

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITI GROUP INC

KENNETH GUNDERMAN

JOHN P. FLETCHER

UNITI FIBER HOLDINGS INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

SLF HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelly E. Farnan Esq.

Attorney at Richards Layton & Finger

920 North King Street, One Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian M. Burnovski Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Blake K. Rohrbacher Esq.

Attorney at Richards Layton & Finger

920 North King Street, One Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Edmund Polubinski Esq. III

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Valerie A. Caras Esq.

Attorney at Richards Layton & Finger

920 North King Street, One Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel S. Magy Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Sabrina Hendershot Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

John P. DiTomo Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Anthony M. Hoffman Esq.

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield

5 Dauphin Street, Suite 301

Mobile, AL 36602

Jerome E. Speegle Esq.

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield

5 Dauphin Street, Suite 301

Mobile, AL 36602

Sabrina M. Hendershot Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Edward S. Sledge Esq. IV

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue North, One Federal Place

Birmingham, AL 35203

Sarah T. Andrade Esq.

Attorney at Bayard

600 North King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stephen B. Brauerman Esq.

Attorney at Bayard

600 North King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew H. Lembke Esq.

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue North, One Federal Place

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

24 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

24 #1

Mediation Instructions

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#5

#4

#3

1 #7

Case Opening Letter

1 #6

Standing Order

1 #5

caption

1 #4

DC Corrected memorandum 11/10/20

1 #2

DC Order 11/4/20

#1

Civil Case Docketed

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/26/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to correct case caption. (SLC) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Uniti Group Inc. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel S. Magy on behalf of Appellee(s) Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc., Uniti Group Inc., Kenneth Gunderman. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian M. Burnovski on behalf of Appellee(s) Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc., Uniti Group Inc., Kenneth Gunderman. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edmund Polubinski III on behalf of Appellee(s) Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc.. Uniti Group Inc., Kenneth Gunderman. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Appellee(s) Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc., Uniti Group Inc., Kenneth Gunderman. [20-3427] (KEF) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Blake Rohrbacher on behalf of Appellee(s) Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc., Uniti Group Inc., Kenneth Gunderman. [20-3427] (BKR) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant SLF Holdings LLC. [20-3427] (MHL) [Entered: 12/16/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jerome E. Speegle on behalf of Appellee(s) John P. Fletcher. [20-3427] (JES) [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sabrina M. Hendershot on behalf of Appellee(s) John P. Fletcher. [20-3427] (JPD) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. DiTomo on behalf of Appellee(s) John P. Fletcher. [20-3427] (JPD) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen B. Brauerman on behalf of Appellant(s) SLF Holdings, LLC. [20-3427] (SBB) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Edward S. Sledge, IV, Esq. for Appellant SLF Holdings LLC Error in Case Caption. Certificate of Service dated 12/10/2020. Service made by Email. [20-3427] (ESS) [Entered: 12/10/2020 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edward S. Sledge IV on behalf of Appellant(s) SLF Holding, LLC. [20-3427] (ESS) [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew H. Lembke on behalf of Appellant(s) SLF Holdings, LLC. [20-3427] (MHL) [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant SLF Holdings LLC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [20-3427] (SBB) [Entered: 12/09/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant SLF Holdings LLC in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01813. (TMM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Uniti Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward S Sledge, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Howard Lembke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen B. Brauerman