This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/26/2021 at 16:05:10 (UTC).

Sleep Number Corporation v. Steven Young, et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Sleep Number Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Steven Young,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1784

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

UDP Labs, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Steven Jay Young

Carl Hewitt

Plaintiff / Appellee

Sleep Number Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Indra Neel Chatterjee

Lucas Dahlin

William Evans

David Leonard Hashmall

William M. Jay

James Lin

Eric Young Su

Rachel M. Walsh

Lauren M. Weber

Brandon J. Wheeler

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew Scott Hansen

Randall J. Pattee

Elizabeth A. Patton

Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft

Natalie I. Uhlemann

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. William M. Jay for Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [5097658] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:42 PM]

Open Document

ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Andrew Scott Hansen for Sleep Number Corporation for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [5097560] [21-1784] (ASH) [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:10 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Declaration of James Lin In Support of Opposition to Motion to Supplement the Re

Open Document #1

UDP Opposition to Motion to Supplement the Record

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketARGUED & SUBMITTED in St. Paul to Judges Lavenski R. Smith, Raymond W. Gruender, Jonathan A. Kobes on 12/15/2021 William M. Jay for Appellants Mr. Steven Jay Young, Mr. Carl Hewitt and UDP Labs, Inc. Andrew S. Hansen for Appellee Sleep Number Corporation. Rebuttal by William M. Jay for Mr. Steven Jay Young, Mr. Carl Hewitt and UDP Labs, Inc. RECORDED. # Click Here To Listen to Oral Argument [5108412] [21-1784] (MMH) [Entered: 12/15/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCOVID-19 CERTIFICATION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Mr. William Evans for Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young. [5097683] [21-1784] (WE) [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCOVID-19 CERTIFICATION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Mr. William M. Jay for Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young. [5097675] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. William M. Jay for Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [5097658] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCOVID-19 CERTIFICATION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Ms. Elizabeth A. Patton for Sleep Number Corporation. [5097568] [21-1784] (EAP) [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCOVID-19 CERTIFICATION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Mr. Andrew Scott Hansen for Sleep Number Corporation. [5097564] [21-1784] (ASH) [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Andrew Scott Hansen for Sleep Number Corporation for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [5097560] [21-1784] (ASH) [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSET FOR ARGUMENT - CASE PLACED ON CALENDAR - for Argument in St. Paul on Wednesday, December 15, 2021. To be heard before Judges Lavenski R. Smith, Raymond W. Gruender and Jonathan A. Kobes in Division I. The courtroom deputy will be Michelle Hyatt. All attorneys presenting oral argument must complete a Response Form. # Click Here to Complete the Oral Argument Response Form . # Click Here for the Complete Calendar PLEASE REVIEW THE ENTIRE CALENDAR CAREFULLY, PARTICULARLY THE COUNSEL NOTICE PAGE. If you are appointed counsel under the Criminal Justice Act and require airline transportation to oral argument, the court will issue a travel authorization the next business day. ACTION REQUIRED All attorneys presenting in-person oral argument must submit either a PDF of their vaccination card or proof of a recent negative COVID-19 test result. To submit your document, please file the document in CM/ECF using the "COVID-19 Certification for Oral Argument" event. This does not replace the need to file the Oral Argument Response Form. # Click Here to View Courthouse Specific COVID-19 Requirements [5097197] [21-1784] (JMM) [Entered: 11/12/2021 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellants Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 09/30/2021 [5082334] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #198 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/20/2021, No. of Pgs.: 33, Court Reporter: Weinbeck, Maria Victoria [5057179] [21-1784] (STL) [Entered: 07/21/2021 01:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Natalie I. Uhlemann for Appellee Sleep Number Corporation w/service 04/13/2021 [5024743] [21-1784] (NIU) [Entered: 04/13/2021 09:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth A. Patton for Appellee Sleep Number Corporation w/service 04/13/2021 [5024739] [21-1784] (EAP) [Entered: 04/13/2021 09:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Randall J. Pattee for Appellee Sleep Number Corporation w/service 04/13/2021 [5024736] [21-1784] (RJP) [Entered: 04/13/2021 08:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew S. Hansen for Appellee Sleep Number Corporation w/service 04/13/2021 [5024729] [21-1784] (ASH) [Entered: 04/13/2021 08:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by David L. Hashmall for Appellants Mr. Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Mr. Steven Jay Young w/service 04/12/2021 [5024192] [21-1784] (DLH) [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant UDP Labs, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5024137] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/09/2021 05:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by William M. Jay for Appellants UDP Labs, Inc., Mr. Carl Hewitt and Mr. Steven Jay Young w/service 04/09/2021 [5024087] [21-1784] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/09/2021 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/19/2021. Appendix due 06/01/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc. and Steven Jay Young due 06/01/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5023721] [21-1784] (CBO) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order filed 3/31/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/6/2021. [5023720] [21-1784] (CBO) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5023718] [21-1784] (CBO) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less