This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/09/2020 at 06:04:18 (UTC).

Slaughter v. Superintendent Camp Hill SCI

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Slaughter filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent Camp Hill SCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2830

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SUPERINTENDENT SCI CAMP HILL, Superintendent

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHRISTOPHER SLAUGHTER

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christopher J. Robinson Esq.

Attorney at Dauphin County Office of District Attorney

101 Market Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher Slaughter

Attorney at Camp Hill SCI

P.O. Box 8837, 2500 Lisburn Road

Camp Hill, PA 17001

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Memorandum_08032020

1 #3

District_Court_Order_08302020

1 #4

Case_Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#5

#3

#4

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Christopher J. Robinson, Esq. for Superintendent SCI Camp Hill requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/16/2020. (DW) [Entered: 11/02/2020 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Christopher Slaughter to Legal Division Letter advising of possible dismissal and letter advising of submission for certificate of appealability. Certificate of Service dated 09/22/2020. Service made by US mail. (DW) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect AND for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (MW) [Entered: 09/17/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION filed by Appellant Christopher Slaughter for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 09/21/2020. Certificate of Service dated 09/02/2020. Service made by US mail. (DW) [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Christopher Slaughter in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00139. (DW) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less