This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2021 at 06:21:34 (UTC).

SL-X Trading Europe Limited v. Bank Of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 SL-X Trading Europe Limited filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank Of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2699

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SL-x Technology USA LLC

SL-x Trading Europe Ltd.

SL-x Technology UK Ltd.

SL-x Trading USA LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp.

Merrill Lynch L.P. Holdings, Inc.

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated

Credit Suisse AG

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Credit Suisse First Boston Next Fund, Inc.

Credit Suisse Prime Securities Services (USA) LLC

Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc.

J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp.

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Prime Dealer Services Corp.

Strategic Investments I, Inc.

UBS AG

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Rishi Bhandari Esq.

Attorney at Mandel Bhandari LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Robert Glunt Esq.

Attorney at Mandel Bhandari LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Adam Selim Hakki Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Michael Mitchell Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

401 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Richard F. Schwed Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Margaret Barone Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Jason M. Hall Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

David G. Januszewski Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Elai Katz Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Herbert Scott Washer Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Robert Y. Sperling Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

George Mastoris Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Staci Yablon

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Robert D. Wick

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1 Citycenter, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Henry Liu Esq.

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1 Citycenter, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jeffrey Cao

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1 Citycenter, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John Playforth

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1 Citycenter, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Michael A. Paskin Esq.

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Peter Ginewicz Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Other Attorneys

Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#62

(#62) MOTION, to extend time, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC, FILED. Service date 11/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3216799] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:14 AM]

#59

(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/17/2021 by CM/ECF. [3213007] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:12 AM]

#58

(#58) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/17/2021 by CM/ECF. [3212999] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:09 AM]

#57

(#57) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Prime Dealer Services Corp. and Strategic Investments I, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3211858] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:19 AM]

#56

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#75

(#74) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L., SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC in 21-2697 Brief due date as 02/07/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 02/07/2022, FILED.[3224623] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/08/2021 08:54 AM]

#72

(#71) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L., SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC and SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. in 21-2697, Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC and SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. in 21-2699, informing Court of proposed due date 02/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224479] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:28 PM]

#69

(#68) CAPTION, Case has been consolidated, AMENDED.[3221430] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/02/2021 11:59 AM]

#67

(#66) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals and remove both appeals from the Courts Expedited Appeals Calendar; Appellants must file a Local Rule 31.2(a) scheduling notification letter within 7 days of the date of this order [ # 3216795-3 ][ # 62 ], filed by Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L. in 21-2697, Appellants SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd., SL-x Technology UK Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC in 21-2699, by WJN, FILED. [3220995][66] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:19 PM]

#41

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L., SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC in 21-2697 Brief due date as 02/07/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 02/07/2022, FILED.[3224623] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/08/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L., SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC and SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. in 21-2697, Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC and SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. in 21-2699, informing Court of proposed due date 02/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224479] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) CAPTION, Case has been consolidated, AMENDED.[3221430] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/02/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals and remove both appeals from the Courts Expedited Appeals Calendar; Appellants must file a Local Rule 31.2(a) scheduling notification letter within 7 days of the date of this order [ # 3216795-3 ][ # 62 ], filed by Appellant SL-X IP S.A.R.L. in 21-2697, Appellants SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd., SL-x Technology UK Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC in 21-2699, by WJN, FILED. [3220995][66] [21-2697, 21-2699] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION, to extend time, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC, FILED. Service date 11/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3216799] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Cao for J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., in case 21-2699, [ # 59 ], ADDED.[3213150] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ATTORNEY, John Playforth for J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., in case 21-2699, [ # 58 ], ADDED.[3213147] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/17/2021 by CM/ECF. [3213007] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/17/2021 by CM/ECF. [3212999] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Prime Dealer Services Corp. and Strategic Investments I, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3211858] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Robert D. Wick for J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., in case 21-2699 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3203864] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3203772] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/02/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp., FILED. Service date 11/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3203763] [21-2699] [Entered: 11/02/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Robert Glunt for SL-x Technology USA LLC SL-x Trading USA LLC SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. SL-x Technology UK Ltd., in case 21-2699 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3202695] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/29/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC, FILED. Service date 10/29/2021 by CM/ECF. [3202630] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/29/2021 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS Americas Inc., UBS Securities LLC and UBS Financial Services Inc., FILED. Service date 10/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3202259] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/29/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3201034] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25239211, FILED.[3201028] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3201018] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant SL-x Technology UK Ltd., SL-x Technology USA LLC, SL-x Trading Europe Ltd. and SL-x Trading USA LLC, FILED. [3200990] [21-2699] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc. is a litigant