This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:13:52 (UTC).

Sir Davis v. Wag Labs, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Sir Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wag Labs, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16802

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant

UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as John and Jane Does 1-5, black entities 1-5

Plaintiff / Appellant

SIR LAWRENCE DAVIS, an individual

Defendant / Appellees

WAG LABS, INC., named as Wag! Labs Incorporated, a Delaware corporation

DAVID CANE, an individual

J. D. KEMPER, spouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher R. Houk Esquire

Attorney at Houk Law Firm, PLLC

4645 S Lakeshore Drive, Suite 13

Tempe, AZ 85282

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kristy L. Peters

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

2425 E Camelback Road, Suite 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Yijee Jeong

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

2425 E Camelback Road, Suite 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12594949] (DJV) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:35 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sir Lawrence Davis Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/30/2022. [12598616] [22-16802] (Houk, Christopher) [Entered: 11/30/2022 08:01 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/18/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12602757] (VS) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:36 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees, 01/25/2023, 10:30 a.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12632614] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2023 10:47 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees, 01/25/2023, 10:30 a.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12632614] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2023 10:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney Kristy L. Peters for Appellee Wag Labs, Inc., in case 22-16802. [12631956] (HH) [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristy L Peters - AZ Bar No. 024756 (Littler Mendelson, P.C. 2425 E Camelback Rd #900, Phoenix, AZ 85016) for Appellees Wag Labs, Inc., David Cane and J. D. Kemper. Date of service: 01/17/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12631943] [22-16802] (Peters, Kristy) [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Kristy L. Peters in 22-16802 substituted by Attorney Yijee Jeong in 22-16802 [12631877] (NAC) [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Yijee Jeong Bar No. 033287 (Littler Mendelson, P.C. 2425 E Camelback Rd #900, Phoenix, AZ 85016) for Appellees Wag Labs, Inc., David Cane and J. D. Kemper. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Christopher R. Houk, Esquire for Appellant Sir Lawrence Davis and Attorney Kristy L. Peters for Appellees David Cane, J. D. Kemper and Wag Labs, Inc.. Date of service: 01/17/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12631837] [22-16802] (Jeong, Yijee) [Entered: 01/17/2023 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/18/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12602757] (VS) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/30/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12599056]. [22-16802] (AD) [Entered: 11/30/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sir Lawrence Davis Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/30/2022. [12598616] [22-16802] (Houk, Christopher) [Entered: 11/30/2022 08:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12594949] (DJV) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sir Lawrence Davis Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/30/2022. Transcript ordered by 12/20/2022. Transcript due 01/20/2023. Appellant Sir Lawrence Davis opening brief due 02/27/2023. Appellees David Cane, J. D. Kemper and Wag Labs, Inc. answering brief due 03/27/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12594924] (RT) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Leah Peters