This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 06:07:25 (UTC).

Simmons v. Trans Express Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Simmons filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Trans Express Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-438

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Charlene Simmons

Defendant / Appellee

Trans Express Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Abdul Karim Hassan Esq.

Attorney at Abdul Hassan Law Group, PLLC

215-28 Hillside Avenue

Queens Village, NY 11427

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aimee S. Lin Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Emory D. Moore Esq. III

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

P. Kevin Connelly Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[2520674] [19-438] [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:11 AM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Trans Express Inc., FILED. Service date 03/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2512590] [19-438] [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:04 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#6

(#6) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511032] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:42 PM]

#8

(#8) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, informing Court of proposed due date 06/03/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511771] [19-438] [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:02 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#23

(#23) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Charlene Simmons Brief due date as 06/03/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 06/03/2019, FILED.[2521083] [19-438] [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:13 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Trans Express Inc., FILED. Service date 03/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2512506] [19-438] [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:21 AM]

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511030] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:41 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2501757] [19-438] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:23 AM]

#17

(#17) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/22/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2518489] [19-438] [Entered: 03/14/2019 04:37 PM]

#7

(#7) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511033] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:43 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Charlene Simmons Brief due date as 06/03/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 06/03/2019, FILED.[2521083] [19-438] [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[2520674] [19-438] [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/22/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2518489] [19-438] [Entered: 03/14/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY, Emory D. Moore, Jr., [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Aimee S. Lin, SUBSTITUTED.[2518151] [19-438] [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY, P. Kevin Connelly for Trans Express Inc., in case 19-438, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2518142] [19-438] [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Trans Express Inc., FILED. Service date 03/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2512590] [19-438] [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Trans Express Inc., FILED. Service date 03/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2512506] [19-438] [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, informing Court of proposed due date 06/03/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511771] [19-438] [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511033] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511032] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2511030] [19-438] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2501763] [19-438] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2501757] [19-438] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, district court receipt # ANYEDC-11213172, FILED.[2501753] [19-438] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Charlene Simmons, FILED. [2501746] [19-438] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.