This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2021 at 06:05:44 (UTC).

Silvia Lasko, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Silvia Lasko filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17181

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOSQUE OF THE GOLDEN RULE

WORLDWIDE MINISTRIES OF ISLAM

Defendant / Appellees

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS

JOE ANDERSON

HSBC

OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

BANK OF AMERICA

SUMMIT FINANCIAL CORP.

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Plaintiff / Appellants

SILVIA REGINA LASKO

Las Vegas, NV 89143

KEITH ALAN LASKO, AKA Imam Keith Alan Lasko

Las Vegas, NV 89143

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Patrick Sakai

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Joel Edward Tasca

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Scott Lachman

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Jacob Bundick

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

3773 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 400 North

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Jason Hicks

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

3773 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 400 North

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Arthur Zorio Esquire

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck

5371 Kietzke Lane

Reno, NV 89511

Maximilien D. Fetaz Esquire

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

100 North City Parkway, Suite 1600

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Sean Keenan McElenney Esquire

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

2 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

Jessica R. Blaemire

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1155 F Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Lilith Vala Xara Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Silvia Regina Lasko

8604 Vivid Violet Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89143

Keith Alan Lasko

8604 Vivid Violet Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89143

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Filed original and 8 copies of Appellants Keith Alan Lasko and Silvia Regina Lasko opening brief of 34 pages (Informal: No). Served on 11/20/2020. [11901406] (LA) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:07 PM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed original and 8 copies of Appellants Keith Alan Lasko and Silvia Regina Lasko opening brief of 34 pages (Informal: No). Served on 11/20/2020. [11901406] (LA) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-17181: Paid] ). Paid in district court on 11/13/2020, receipt number NVLAS072778. [11901398] (LA) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Jessica R. Blaemire for party(s) Appellee Ocwen Financial Corporation, in case 20-17181. [11897224] (QDL) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica Robbin Blaemire (Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 1155 F St NW Washington DC 20004) for Appellee Ocwen Financial Corporation. Date of service: 11/18/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11897217] [20-17181] (Blaemire, Jessica) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11883321] (CKP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Keith Alan Lasko and Silvia Regina Lasko opening brief due 01/04/2021. Appellees Joe Anderson, Bank of America, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, HSBC, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Summit Financial Corp. and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. answering brief due 02/03/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11882705] (JBS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocwen Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SUMMIT FINANCIAL CORP AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO is a litigant

Latest cases where LSF9 Master Participation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant