This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:08:25 (UTC).

Silva v. United States

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Silva filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2005

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

BARBARA SILVA

Jemez Springs, NM 87025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Manuel Lucero Esq.

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Paige Messec

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Barbara Silva

206 San Diego Drive

Jemez Springs, NM 87025

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819475] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - response to appellant's motion to reconsider due by 04/08/2021 for United States of America. Served on 04/01/2021. [21-2005] [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819435] Appellant's reply to motion for extension of time to file answer brief, construed as a motion to reconsider the court's 03/29/2021 order granting appellee's requested extension of time filed by Barbara Silva. Served on 03/31/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 04/01/2021 by SDS to add text to entry] [21-2005] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10818324] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellee's brief now due 04/30/2021 for United States of America. No further extensions may be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 03/29/2021. [21-2005] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10818267] Motion filed by Appellee United States of America to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 04/30/2021. Served on: 03/29/2021. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-2005] PM [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811158] Appellant brief filed by Barbara Silva. Original and 4 copies. Served on 02/24/2021 by US Mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellee's brief due 03/31/2021 for United States of America [21-2005] [Entered: 03/01/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808057] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807920] Entry of appearance filed by Barbara Silva. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/09/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/16/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807585] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 03/24/2021 for Barbara Silva. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 03/05/2021. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807580] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Manuel Lucero, Esq. for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket[10807577] Entry of appearance submitted by Manuel Lucero for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 02/12/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-2005] ML [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807214] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Paige Messec for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/11/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket[10807208] Entry of appearance submitted by C. Paige Messec for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/11/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2005]--[Edited 02/11/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 2/11/2021.] PM [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10805028] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/03/2021. Notice of appearance due on 03/05/2021 for Barbara Silva, and Notice of appearance due on 02/17/2021 for United States of America. [21-2005] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less