This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/06/2022 at 05:02:57 (UTC).

Sierra Club v. West Virginia DEP

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Sierra Club filed an Other lawsuit against West Virginia DEP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SIERRA CLUB

WEST VIRGINIA RIVERS COALITION

WEST VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS CONSERVANCY

INDIAN CREEK WATERSHED ASSOCIATION

APPALACHIAN VOICES

CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK

Respondents

WEST VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

HAROLD WARD, in his official capacity as Secretary of the West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection

Intervenor

MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Benjamin Alan Luckett

Attorney at APPALACHIAN MOUNTAIN ADVOCATES

P. O. Box 507

Lewisburg, WV 24901-0000

Derek Owen Teaney

Attorney at APPALACHIAN MOUNTAIN ADVOCATES

P. O. Box 507

Lewisburg, WV 24901-0000

Respondent Attorneys

Thomas T. Lampman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1900 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25305

Caleb Allen Seckman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1900 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25305

Lindsay Sara See

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1900 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25305

Jason Eric Wandling

Attorney at WEST VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

601 57Th Street, Se

Charleston, WV 25304-0000

Intervenor Attorneys

Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

George Peter Sibley III

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to intervene [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [1001086810] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/05/2022 04:07 PM]

#17

(#17) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sierra Club, West Virginia Rivers Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Indian Creek Watershed Association, Appalachian Voices and Chesapeake Climate Action Network.. [1001086066] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/05/2022 08:49 AM]

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Climate Action Network. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085939] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:49 PM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Appalachian Voices. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085938] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:48 PM]

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Creek Watershed Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085937] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:48 PM]

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Virginia Highlands Conservancy. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001085936] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:47 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Virginia Rivers Coalition. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085935] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:46 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sierra Club. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085934] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:45 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Derek O. Teaney for Sierra Club, West Virginia Rivers Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Indian Creek Watershed Association, Appalachian Voices and Chesapeake Climate Action Network. [1001085932] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:44 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Caleb A. Seckman for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085763] [22-1008] Caleb Seckman [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:05 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas T. Lampman for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085759] [22-1008] Thomas Lampman [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:02 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay S. See for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085753] [22-1008] Lindsay See [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:00 PM]

6 #4

Appearance of Counsel - J. Pierce Lamberson

6 #3

Appearance of Counsel - George P. Sibley, III

6 #2

Disclosure statement

6 #1

Unopposed Motion to Intervene

#5

(#5) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. Date petition for review or application filed: 01/03/2022. [ # 3 ] petition for review. Mailed to: CT Corporation System. [1001085342] Administrative Record due 02/14/2022 [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:43 AM]

3 #2

Agency order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to intervene [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [1001086810] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/05/2022 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sierra Club, West Virginia Rivers Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Indian Creek Watershed Association, Appalachian Voices and Chesapeake Climate Action Network.. [1001086066] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/05/2022 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Climate Action Network. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085939] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Appalachian Voices. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085938] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Creek Watershed Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085937] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Virginia Highlands Conservancy. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001085936] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Virginia Rivers Coalition. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085935] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sierra Club. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001085934] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Derek O. Teaney for Sierra Club, West Virginia Rivers Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Indian Creek Watershed Association, Appalachian Voices and Chesapeake Climate Action Network. [1001085932] [22-1008] Derek Teaney [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Caleb A. Seckman for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085763] [22-1008] Caleb Seckman [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas T. Lampman for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085759] [22-1008] Thomas Lampman [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay S. See for Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. [1001085753] [22-1008] Lindsay See [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC to intervene. Date and method of service: 01/04/2022 ecf. [1001085671] [22-1008] George Sibley [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from Harold Ward and West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. Date petition for review or application filed: 01/03/2022. [ # 3 ] petition for review. Mailed to: CT Corporation System. [1001085342] Administrative Record due 02/14/2022 [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 3 ] petition for review. Originating case number: WQC-2021-005. [1001085288] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: WQC-2021-005. Case manager: KHancock. [1001085208] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Petition for review of agency order filed by Appalachian Voices, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Indian Creek Watershed Association, Sierra Club, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy and West Virginia Rivers Coalition .[1001085266] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) Electronic filing fee paid. Filing Fee: $500.00. Receipt Number: A04-71602-286. [1001085214] [22-1008] KH [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection is a litigant

Latest cases where Indian Creek Watershed Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant