This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:19 (UTC).

Shuntay Brown v. Pennsylvania Higher Education, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Shuntay Brown filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Pennsylvania Higher Education. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5200

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

United States Department of Housing & Urban Development

United States Department of Education

Trans Union LLC

District of Columbia Housing Authority

Equifax Information Solutions, Inc.

Pennsylvania Higher Education Agency

Plaintiff / Appellant

Shuntay Antonio Brown, Rev.

Alexandria, VA 22302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Geoffrey S. Irwin

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

H. Mark Stichel

Attorney at Astrachan Gunst Thomas & Ahn

217 East Redwood Street, Suite 2100

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Henry Mark Stichel

Attorney at Astrachan Gunst Thomas, P.C.

217 East Redwood Street, Suite 2100

Baltimore, MD 21202

Taylor T. Lankford

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Constantinos George Panagopoulos

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006-1157

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shuntay Antonio Brown

Po Box 16513

Alexandria, VA 22302

 

Court Documents

Open Document

LETTER [1797484] sent regarding attorney membership to Geoffrey S. Irwin for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Application for Admission due 08/15/2019. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1804183] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1803061-2 ] filed by Trans Union LLC [Service Date: 08/29/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 354 words. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:50 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1797831] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 08/19/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:52 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Exhibits

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799503] filed by H. Mark Stichel and co-counsel William M. Huse on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:34 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL [1797482] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00979-CKK filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5200. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Response to Order Filed

Open Document

STATEMENT [1804181] with Disclosure Listing filed by Trans Union LLC [Service Date: 08/29/2019 ] [19-5200]--[Edited 08/29/2019 by SHA - Document Type Modified by the Clerk's Office] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:45 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1803061] to hold case in abeyance filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown (Service Date: 08/21/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5200] [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:50 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1804373] for response [ # 1804183-2 ] filed by Trans Union LLC. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

LETTER [1797486] sent regarding attorney membership to H. Mark Stichel for Trans Union LLC. Application for Admission due 08/15/2019. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1806453] certify, to appoint counsel filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown (Service Date: 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5200] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:54 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1806453] certify, to appoint counsel filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown (Service Date: 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5200] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1804373] for response [ # 1804183-2 ] filed by Trans Union LLC. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1804409] marked "return to sender - unclaimed". Certified Mail [1797838-2] had been sent to Party Shuntay Antonio Brown. [19-5200] [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1804183] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1803061-2 ] filed by Trans Union LLC [Service Date: 08/29/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 354 words. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT [1804181] with Disclosure Listing filed by Trans Union LLC [Service Date: 08/29/2019 ] [19-5200]--[Edited 08/29/2019 by SHA - Document Type Modified by the Clerk's Office] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1803061] to hold case in abeyance filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown (Service Date: 08/21/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5200] [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE [1802807] to order [ # 1797831-2 ] filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown (Service Date: 08/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5200] [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799503] filed by H. Mark Stichel and co-counsel William M. Huse on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [19-5200] (Stichel, Henry) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1797838] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 1010] of order [ # 1797831-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/19/2019 from Shuntay Antonio Brown. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797831] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 08/19/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1797486] sent regarding attorney membership to H. Mark Stichel for Trans Union LLC. Application for Admission due 08/15/2019. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1797484] sent regarding attorney membership to Geoffrey S. Irwin for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Application for Admission due 08/15/2019. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL [1797482] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00979-CKK filed by Shuntay Antonio Brown. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5200. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5200] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.