This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/23/2019 at 06:10:38 (UTC).

Shkelzen Berisha v. Guy Lawson, et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Shkelzen Berisha filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Guy Lawson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10315

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

SIMON & SCHUSTER, INC.

RECORDED BOOKS, INC.

ALEXANDER PODRIZKI

DAVID PACKOUZ

GUY LAWSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHKELZEN BERISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jose Javier Teurbe-Tolon

Attorney at Law Offices of Jose Teurbe-Tolon, PA

2250 Sw 3Rd Ave Ste 303

Miami, FL 33129

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Alan Roman

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt

1 Se 3Rd Ave 25Th Fl

Miami, FL 33131

Elizabeth A. McNamara

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas Ste 2100

New York, NY 10020

Joanna E. Summerscales

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas Ste 2100

New York, NY 10020

Taaj M. Reaves

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas Ste 2100

New York, NY 10020

John M. Browning

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas Ste 2100

New York, NY 10020

Michael Constantine Marsh

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

3 Brickell City Ctr, 98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brandon Perry Rose

Attorney at AXS Law Group, PLLC

2121 Nw 2Nd Ave Ste 201

Miami, FL 33127

Jason Michael Zoladz

Attorney at Law Offices of Jason M. Zoladz

1450 2Nd St

Santa Monica, CA 90026

Jeffrey W. Gutchess

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3500

Miami, FL 33131

Daniel Edward Tropin

Attorney at Harke Clasby & Bushman, LLP

9699 Ne 2Nd Ave

Miami Shores, FL 33138

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #9

District Court Endorsed Order, DE # 135

Open Document #7

District Court Endorsed Order, DE # 117

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth A. McNamara for Appellees Guy Lawson, David Packouz, Alexander Podrizki, Recorded Books, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10315] (ECF: Elizabeth McNamara) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jason Michael Zoladz for Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. [19-10315] (ECF: Jason Zoladz) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Constantine Marsh for David Packouz and Alexander Podrizki and Ryan Alan Roman for Guy Lawson, David Packouz, Alexander Podrizki, Recorded Books, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. [19-10315] (ECF: Michael Marsh) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mr. John M. Browning for Guy Lawson, David Packouz, Alexander Podrizki, Recorded Books, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. [19-10315] (ECF: John Browning) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth A. McNamara for Guy Lawson, David Packouz, Alexander Podrizki, Recorded Books, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. [19-10315] (ECF: Elizabeth McNamara) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Jason Michael Zoladz for Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. Appellant's brief is due on 03/18/2019. [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Michael Zoladz for Shkelzen Berisha. [19-10315] (ECF: Jason Zoladz) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Jason M. Zoladz is GRANTED. (CK)[8691700-2] [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Jason M. Zoladz for Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. [8691700-1] [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • According to our records, Jason M. Zoladz is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed. [Entered: 02/07/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason M. Zoladz for Shkelzen Berisha. [19-10315] (ECF: Brandon Rose) [Entered: 02/06/2019 09:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ryan Alan Roman for Guy Lawson, David Packouz, Alexander Podrizki, Recorded Books, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. [19-10315] (ECF: Ryan Roman) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/04/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Brandon Perry Rose for Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Brandon Perry Rose for Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-10315] (ECF: Brandon Rose) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10315] (ECF: Brandon Rose) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Shkelzen Berisha. [19-10315] (ECF: Brandon Rose) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon Perry Rose for Shkelzen Berisha. [19-10315] (ECF: Brandon Rose) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Shkelzen Berisha on 01/17/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/05/2019 as to Appellant Shkelzen Berisha. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2019 as to Appellee Guy Lawson [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIMON & SCHUSTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Perry Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey W. Gutchess