This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 06:10:16 (UTC).

Sheryl Clark v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Sheryl Clark filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16756

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHERYL CLARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Vivian Orlando

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Larry M. Golub Esquire

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

633 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sarah Ball

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Craig Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Georg M. Capielo

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Jack B. Winters Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11873469] (CL) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:54 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 10/27/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11850844] (CL) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:24 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Transamerica Life Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11825764] [20-16756] (Golub, Larry) [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:48 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/06/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11825536] (CL) [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:11 AM]

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11873469] (CL) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellant Sheryl Clark to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Sheryl Clark opening brief due 12/09/2020. Appellee Transamerica Life Insurance Company answering brief due 01/08/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11866221] (JN) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Sheryl Clark. New requested due date is 12/09/2020. [11866104] [20-16756] (Winters, Jack) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 10/27/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11850844] (CL) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/16/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11826308]. [20-16756] (AD) [Entered: 09/16/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Transamerica Life Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11825764] [20-16756] (Golub, Larry) [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/06/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11825536] (CL) [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11823731]. [20-16756] (AD) [Entered: 09/15/2020 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sheryl Clark Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823686] [20-16756] (Winters, Jack) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sheryl Clark Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/18/2020. Appellant Sheryl Clark opening brief due 11/09/2020. Appellee Transamerica Life Insurance Company answering brief due 12/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11820125] (JMR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transamerica Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Ball

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Winters, Jr.