This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:22 (UTC).

Sherrod Brumfield v. Robert Tanner, Warden

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Sherrod Brumfield filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Robert Tanner, Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30564

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

SHERROD BRUMFIELD

Respondent / Appellee

ROBERT C. TANNER, WARDEN, B. B. RAYBURN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Autumn Alycia Town

Attorney at Law Office of Autumn Town

700 Camp Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher James Ponoroff

Attorney at District Attorney's Office

619 S. White Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

Donna Rau Andrieu

Attorney at District Attorney's Office

619 S. White Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9104478-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 08/08/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:07 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield for filing Appeal fee--Motion to File in forma pauperis until 09/06/2019 [19-30564] (Autumn Alycia Town ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 07:00 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:58 AM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 10/07/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield. Brief in Support due on 10/07/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield [19-30564] (CBW) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:18 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 10/07/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield. Brief in Support due on 10/07/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield [19-30564] (CBW) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30564] (CBW) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-8775. Electronic ROA due on 09/10/2019. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 08/26/2019 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield. Extension Granted in Part to and including 08/23/2019. Fee deadline updated to 08/23/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield for filing Appeal fee--Motion to File in forma pauperis until 09/06/2019 [19-30564] (Autumn Alycia Town ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 07:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Christopher James Ponoroff is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the DA's Office. [19-30564] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Attorney Donna Rau Andrieu added as counsel of record for Appellee Robert C. Tanner, Warden, B. B. Rayburn Correctional Center in 19-30564 [19-30564] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9104478-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 08/08/2019 for Appellant Sherrod Brumfield. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sherrod Brumfield. [19-30564] (SEP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.