This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/21/2021 at 06:11:46 (UTC).

Sherman Nealy, et al v. Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Sherman Nealy filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Warner Chappell Music, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-13232

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MUSIC SPECIALIST, INC.

SHERMAN NEALY

Defendant / Appellees

WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.

ARTIST PUBLISHING GROUP, L.L.C.

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Peter G. Herman

Attorney at Peter Herman, PA

3020 Ne 32Nd Ave Ste 226

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot

Attorney at Talbot Legal Consultants

2719 Hollywood Blvd Ste 5067

Hollywood, FL 33020

Brady F. Williamson

Attorney at Salzano Jackson & Lampert, LLP

275 Madison Ave 35Th Fl

New York, NY 10016

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan L. Gaines

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Karen L. Stetson

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Matthew F. Herman

Attorney at The Herman Law Group, PA

1401 E Broward Blvd Ste 206

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jonathan Z. King

Attorney at Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

114 W 47 St 21 Fl

New York, NY 10036-1525

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:23 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:00 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:52 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Sherman Nealy and Music Specialist, Inc. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:21 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 09/30/2021 as to Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [Entered: 10/01/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen L. Stetson for Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/05/2021 11:36 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan L. Gaines for Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Jonathan Gaines) [Entered: 10/05/2021 11:42 AM]

Open Document

Letter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Jonathan L. Gaines for Appellees Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. and Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:23 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:06 PM]

Open Document

Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Karen L. Stetson for Appellees Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:38 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/21/2021 02:59 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/21/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jonathan L. Gaines for Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. and Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Karen L. Stetson for Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. and Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions. [Entered: 10/21/2021 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Karen L. Stetson for Appellees Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Sherman Nealy and Music Specialist, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-13232, 21-12458] [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Jonathan L. Gaines for Appellees Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. and Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan L. Gaines for Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Jonathan Gaines) [Entered: 10/05/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen L. Stetson for Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. and Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. [21-13232] (ECF: Karen Stetson) [Entered: 10/05/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 09/30/2021 as to Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [Entered: 10/01/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Sherman Nealy and Music Specialist, Inc. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Sherman Nealy and Music Specialist, Inc.. Document Not Legible/Complete Counsel must file a corrected Appearance of Counsel form and update information in Pacer to reflect correct address. [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carlton Lamar-Phillip Talbot for Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate appeals 21-12458 and 21-13232 filed by Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy. Motion is Unopposed. [9491628-1] [21-13232] (ECF: Carlton Talbot) [Entered: 09/23/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Music Specialist, Inc. and Sherman Nealy on 09/22/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/06/2021 as to Appellant Music Specialist, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/20/2021 as to Appellee Artist Publishing Group, L.L.C. [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARTIST PUBLISHING GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Zachary King