This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

Shemick Watts v. Robert Fox

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Shemick Watts filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Robert Fox. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16391

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

SHEMICK F. WATTS

Tracy, CA 95304

Respondent / Appellee

ROBERT W. FOX, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Shemick F. Watts

Attorney at DVI - DEUEL VOCATIONAL INSTITUTION

23500 Kasson Road

Tracy, CA 95304

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Chung Mi Choi

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: to proceed in forma pauperis. Motion filed by Appellant Shemick F. Watts. [11395924] (NAC) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:20 PM]

#1

(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 06/12/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. (Electronic: PACER) [11363751] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: to proceed in forma pauperis. Motion filed by Appellant Shemick F. Watts. [11395924] (NAC) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#2) RECEIVED (COPY) CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL. Record Part: State Lodged Docs, Sealed: n. [11366770] (SOS) [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 06/12/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. (Electronic: PACER) [11363751] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less