This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2021 at 05:43:28 (UTC).

Shell Energy North America (US v. FERC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Shell Energy North America US filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1148

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shell Energy North America (US), L.P.

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Britt Cass Steckman

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1904664] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 08/02/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/16/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 08/02/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/02/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 08/16/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 08/16/2021 [21-1148] [Entered: 07/01/2021 10:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1904661] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1904658-2 ] [21-1148] [Entered: 07/01/2021 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1904658] of a decision by federal agency filed by Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. [Service Date: 06/30/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1148] [Entered: 07/01/2021 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1148] [Entered: 07/01/2021 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less