This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/27/2021 at 06:12:17 (UTC).

Shaykh Muhammad Al Saud v. Albert Trevino, et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Shaykh Muhammad Al Saud filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Albert Trevino,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16088

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

RIDENOUR, Sergeant

C. SIERA, Position Guard at Arizona State Prison Florence-Eyman SMU-1

RICARDO MONTES, Security Captain

ALBERT TREVINO, Prison Secuirty Guard

DAVID SHINN, Director, ADOC Director

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHAYKH MUHAMMAD ABDUL BIN TALAL AL SAUD, AKA Shaykh Muhammad Abdul Aziz Khalid Bin Talal Alsaud

Florence, AZ 85132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shaykh Muhammad Abdul Bin Talal Al Saud

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - FLORENCE

P.O. Box 8200

Florence, AZ 85132

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

#5

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12197471] (CKP) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/31/2021. [12196739] (RR) [Entered: 08/10/2021 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail returned on 07/20/2021 addressed to Shaykh Muhammad Abdul Bin Talal Al Saud, re: [ # 2 ] Clerk Order. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - FLORENCE, Central Unit, P.O. Box 8200, Florence, AZ 85132. [12180681] (QDL) [Entered: 07/22/2021 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received notice of change of address dated 07/04/2021 from Shaykh Muhammad Abdul Bin Talal Al Saud. New address: Arizona State Prison Central Unit, P.O. Box 8200, Florence, AZ 85132. [12173750]--[Edited: address updated. 07/15/2021 by SLM] (NAC) [Entered: 07/15/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12163491] (CKP) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Shaykh Muhammad Abdul Bin Talal Al Saud opening brief due 08/23/2021. Appellees Albert Trevino, et al. answering brief due 09/21/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12156278] (JPD) [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less