This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2019 at 06:10:54 (UTC).

Shawna Lemon v. Myers Bigel, P.A.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Shawna Lemon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Myers Bigel, P A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1380

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHAWNA CANNON LEMON

Defendant / Appellees

MYERS BIGEL, P.A., f/k/a Myers Bigel & Sibley and Myers Bigel Sibley & Sajovec, P.A.

UNNAMED OTHERS

LYNNE A. BORCHERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Heydt Philbeck Esq. Sr.

Attorney at BAILEY & DIXON

P. O. Box 1351

Raleigh, NC 27602-1351

Brandon S. Neuman

Attorney at SHANAHAN LAW GROUP

128 East Hargett Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Nathaniel James Pencook

Attorney at SHANAHAN LAW GROUP

128 East Hargett Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Nathaniel J. Pencook

Attorney at SHANAHAN LAW GROUP

128 East Hargett Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Isaac Augustin Linnartz

Attorney at SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, LLP

P. O. Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

Kerry Anne Shad

Attorney at SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, LLP

P. O. Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

Kerry Shad

Attorney at SMITH, ANDERSON, BLOUNT, DORSETT, MITCHELL & JERNIGAN, LLP

P. O. Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER filed [1000512250] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 7/15/2019. Number of days granted: 55. Opening brief and appendix due 07/15/2019. Response brief due 08/30/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:44 AM]

#14

(#14) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Lynne A. Borchers and Myers Bigel, P.A.. [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:35 PM]

#13

(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1380] LP [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:38 PM]

#12

(#12) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Shawna Cannon Lemon. [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:23 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Shawna Cannon Lemon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000501041] [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:22 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Heydt Philbeck of Bailey & Dixon, LLP for Shawna Cannon Lemon. [1000501040] [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:20 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Shawna Cannon Lemon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000500837] [19-1380] Brandon Neuman [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:45 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brandon S. Neuman for Shawna Cannon Lemon. [1000500737] [19-1380] Brandon Neuman [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:29 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Lynne A. Borchers and Myers Bigel, P.A.. [1000498833] [19-1380] Kerry Shad [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:20 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Myers Bigel, P.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000496608] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:35 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lynne A. Borchers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000496606] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:34 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Isaac A. Linnartz for Myers Bigel, P.A. and Lynne A. Borchers. [1000496602] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:30 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/21/2019. Response Brief due 06/20/2019. Mailed to: Nathaniel Pencook. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:53 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00200-FL. Mailed to: Nathaniel Pencook. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:51 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00200-FL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:49 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER filed [1000512250] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 7/15/2019. Number of days granted: 55. Opening brief and appendix due 07/15/2019. Response brief due 08/30/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Lynne A. Borchers and Myers Bigel, P.A.. [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1380] LP [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Shawna Cannon Lemon. [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Shawna Cannon Lemon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000501041] [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Heydt Philbeck of Bailey & Dixon, LLP for Shawna Cannon Lemon. [1000501040] [19-1380] John Philbeck [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Shawna Cannon Lemon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000500837] [19-1380] Brandon Neuman [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brandon S. Neuman for Shawna Cannon Lemon. [1000500737] [19-1380] Brandon Neuman [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Lynne A. Borchers and Myers Bigel, P.A.. [1000498833] [19-1380] Kerry Shad [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Myers Bigel, P.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000496608] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lynne A. Borchers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000496606] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Isaac A. Linnartz for Myers Bigel, P.A. and Lynne A. Borchers. [1000496602] [19-1380] Isaac Linnartz [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/21/2019. Response Brief due 06/20/2019. Mailed to: Nathaniel Pencook. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00200-FL. Mailed to: Nathaniel Pencook. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00200-FL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1380] JSN [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less