This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 06:09:42 (UTC).

Shawn Riley v. David Ewing

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Shawn Riley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against David Ewing. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1279

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DAVID EWING, Chaplain

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHAWN RILEY

Boscobel, WI 53805-1000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca Ann Paulson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Jody J. Schmelzer

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shawn Riley

Attorney at WISCONSIN SECURE PROGRAM FACILITY

P.O. Box 1000

Boscobel, WI 53805-1000

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#7

(#7) Appearance form filed by Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellee David Ewing. [7] [6988390] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1279]-[Edited 03/04/2019 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Schmelzer, Jody) [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:45 PM]

#1

Civil Rights Case

#4

(#4) ORDER: The appellant shall file a notarized statement or a declaration (in compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1746) setting forth the date the notice of appeal was deposited in the prison's internal mail system and stating whether first class postage was prepaid. See Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(c). DW [4] Statement due for Appellant Shawn Riley by 03/15/2019. [4] [6987870] [19-1279] (AD) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:26 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER re: Declaration. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to briefing. The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/29/2019 for Shawn Riley. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/29/2019 for David Ewing. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/19/2019 for Appellant Shawn Riley. DW [6992307] [19-1279] (AP) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:13 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed Declaration of Appellant Shawn Riley, pursuant to the Court's order of February 28, 2019. [8] [6991470] [19-1279] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:59 PM]

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Shawn Riley. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6986813] [19-1279] (VG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:50 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Shawn Riley. [5] [6988223] [19-1279] (FP) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:48 AM]

#3

(#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][6987325] [19-1279] (CCG) [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:50 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

#6

(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Shawn Riley. [6] [6988224] [19-1279] (FP) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:50 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re: Declaration. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to briefing. The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/29/2019 for Shawn Riley. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/29/2019 for David Ewing. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/19/2019 for Appellant Shawn Riley. DW [6992307] [19-1279] (AP) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed Declaration of Appellant Shawn Riley, pursuant to the Court's order of February 28, 2019. [8] [6991470] [19-1279] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Appearance form filed by Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellee David Ewing. [7] [6988390] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1279]-[Edited 03/04/2019 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Schmelzer, Jody) [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Shawn Riley. [6] [6988224] [19-1279] (FP) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Shawn Riley. [5] [6988223] [19-1279] (FP) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: The appellant shall file a notarized statement or a declaration (in compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1746) setting forth the date the notice of appeal was deposited in the prison's internal mail system and stating whether first class postage was prepaid. See Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(c). DW [4] Statement due for Appellant Shawn Riley by 03/15/2019. [4] [6987870] [19-1279] (AD) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][6987325] [19-1279] (CCG) [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Shawn Riley. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6986813] [19-1279] (VG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Shawn Riley by 02/21/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/28/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/18/2019. [1] [6984525] [19-1279] (PS) [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.