This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2019 at 06:09:07 (UTC).

Shaun Younger v. Experian Information Solutions

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Shaun Younger filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11487

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

SHAUN J YOUNGER

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Rebecca Crawford Reynolds

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Leilus Jackson Young Jr.

Attorney at Ferguson Frost Moore & Young, LLP

1400 Urban Ctr Dr Ste 200

Birmingham, AL 35242

Meir Feder

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey St

New York, NY 10281-1047

Gregory Russell Hanthorn

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Wilson Franklin Green

Attorney at Fleenor & Green, LLP

1657 Mcfarland Blvd N Ste G2A

Tuscaloosa, AL 35406

W. Whitney Seals

Attorney at Cochrun & Seals, LLC

Po Box 10448

Birmingham, AL 35202-0448

John Crad Hubbard

Attorney at John C. Hubbard, LLC

Po Box 953

Birminham, AL 35203

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Alan Daniel Leeth

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Misty Peterson

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

John Anthony Love

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matthew Thomas Mitchell

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Kirkland E. Reid

Attorney at Jones Walker, LLP

11 N Water St Ste 1200

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals 19-11487 and 19-11940 is GRANTED (AGW) [ # 8783421-2 ] [ # 8783463-2 ] [19-11487, 19-11940] [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc. [ # 8783421-2 ] filed by Attorney Wilson Franklin Green for Appellee Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:38 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-11487, 19-11940 filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8783421-1] [19-11487] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Whitney Seals for Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Hubbard for Shuan Younger [19-11487] (ECF: John Hubbard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:39 PM]

Open Document

Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Appellant's brief was originally due on 05/28/2019. Appellant's brief is now due on 06/11/2019 as to Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc., with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:58 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meir Feder on behalf of Appellant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. [19-11487] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:14 PM]

Open Restricted Document #8

District Court Order, DE # 73

Open Restricted Document #4

District Court Opinion, DE # 143

Open Restricted Document #3

District Court Judgment, DE # 144

Open Restricted Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Wilson Franklin Green, John Crad Hubbard, and W. Whitney Seals for Shaun J Younger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals 19-11487 and 19-11940 is GRANTED (AGW) [ # 8783421-2 ] [ # 8783463-2 ] [19-11487, 19-11940] [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc. [ # 8783421-2 ] filed by Attorney Wilson Franklin Green for Appellee Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-11487, 19-11940 filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8783421-1] [19-11487] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Whitney Seals for Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Hubbard for Shuan Younger [19-11487] (ECF: John Hubbard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Wilson Franklin Green for Shaun J Younger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Appellant's brief was originally due on 05/28/2019. Appellant's brief is now due on 06/11/2019 as to Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc., with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Shaun J Younger. [19-11487] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meir Feder on behalf of Appellant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. [19-11487] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory Russell Hanthorn for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. [19-11487] (ECF: Gregory Hanthorn) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • *DOCKETED IN ERROR APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meir Feder for Appellee [19-11487]--[Edited 04/24/2019 by BH] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc. on 04/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/30/2019 as to Appellant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/14/2019 as to Appellee Shaun J Younger [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.