This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/21/2020 at 06:17:46 (UTC).

Sharyl Bloom v. Royalty Equity Lending, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Sharyl Bloom filed an Other lawsuit against Royalty Equity Lending, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1011

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

SHARYL GWEN BLOOM

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Debtor

In re: SHARYL GWEN BLOOM

Appellee

ROYALTY EQUITY LENDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Sharyl Gwen Bloom

1610 Mandeville Canyon Road

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Appellee Attorney

David P. Jacob

Attorney at Law Offices of David P. Jacob P.C.

5950 Canoga Avenue

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

#2

Briefing Order

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

2 #4

E-Filing Administrative Order

2 #5

BAP Rules

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed original of Party Sharyl Gwen Bloom's motion extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 04/06/2020 and declaration; served on 03/06/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of readiness received. (CLS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court - COPY: Appellant's Designation of Record & Statement of Issues (one document) filed in Bk.Ct. on 01/30/2020. (VB) [Entered: 01/31/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the Notice of transcripts. filed in Bk. Ct. 01/17/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Sharyl Gwen Bloom. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Sharyl Gwen Bloom's opening brief due 03/06/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 01/17/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less