This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/17/2020 at 06:05:18 (UTC).

Sharon Whitehead v. Aurora Pump Company

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Sharon Whitehead filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Aurora Pump Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1676

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendants

UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION

STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS USA LLC, f/k/a Peerless Pumps Co.

MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, INC., successor-in-interest to NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS

JOHN CRANE INCORPORATED

CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC

PABST BREWING COMPANY, LLC

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.

TACO, INC.

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-in-interst to Buffalo Pumps

Defendant / Appellees

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

COVIL CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, individually and as successor-in-interest to ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHARON K. WHITEHEAD, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of JAMES T. WHITEHEAD, Deceased

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly Sullivan

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-6037

Mary Elizabeth O'Neill

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-6037

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue, P. O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636-0000

Curtis James Shipley

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

P. O. Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Renee Marie Melancon

Attorney at DEAN OMAR BRANHAM SHIRLEY, LLP

302 North Market Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Lisa White Shirley

Attorney at DEAN OMAR BRANHAM SHIRLEY, LLP

302 North Market Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Other Attorneys

David Brandt Oakley Esq.

Attorney at POOLE BROOKE PLUMLEE PC

4705 Columbus Street

Virginia Beach, VA 23462-6749

Amy Church Drayton

Attorney at DEAN & GIBSON, PLLC

301 South Mcdowell Street

Charlotte, NC 28204-2686

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

#19

#18

#17

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 24 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 09/18/2020. Response brief due 10/19/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000783049] [20-1676] DL [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION by Sharon K. Whitehead to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 18, 2020.. Date and method of service: 07/28/2020 ecf. [1000783015] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill for Aurora Pump Company. [1000775675] [20-1676] Mary O'Neill [Entered: 07/15/2020 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket correction requested from Aurora Pump Company. Re: [ # 21 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by M. Elizabeth O'Neill for Aurora Pump Company. [1000774978] [20-1676] Mary O'Neill [Entered: 07/14/2020 06:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2020. Response Brief due 09/18/2020. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Curtis J. Shipley for Covil Corporation. [1000768679] [20-1676] Curtis Shipley [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000768674] [20-1676] Leslie Packer [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leslie C. Packer for Covil Corporation. [1000768672] [20-1676] Leslie Packer [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/02/2020 08:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767620] [20-1676] Kimberly Sullivan [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimberly Sullivan for Aurora Pump Company. [1000767615] [20-1676] Kimberly Sullivan [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa W. Shirley for Sharon K. Whitehead. [1000767458] [20-1676] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sharon K. Whitehead. [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon K. Whitehead. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767450] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Renee M. Melancon for Sharon K. Whitehead. [1000767443] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The William Powell Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000767061] [20-1676] David Oakley [Entered: 06/30/2020 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David B. Oakley for The William Powell Company. [1000767057] [20-1676] David Oakley [Entered: 06/30/2020 04:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00091-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite, Jessica Michelle Dean, Amy C. Drayton, William Michael Starr, Sabrina G. Stone, Tracy Edward Tomlin. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00091-LCB-JLW. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PABST BREWING COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Taco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY is a litigant