This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:48 (UTC).

Sharon Wazney v. Robert Wazney

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Sharon Wazney filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Robert Wazney. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1737

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ROBERT WILLIAM WAZNEY

Bishopville, SC 29010-2021

Plaintiff / Appellees

SHARON RENEE CHABASSOL, a/k/a Sharon R. wazney

SHARON RENEE CHABASSOLE, a/k/a Sharon R. Wazney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Robert William Wazney

Attorney at LEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

990 Wisacky Highway

Bishopville, SC 29010-2021

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

William Ceth Land

Attorney at LAND, PARKER & WELCH

P. O. Box 138

Manning, SC 29102-0000

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Fee notice

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:25 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed [1000556069] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Informal Opening Brief and application to proceed in forma pauperis are due 08/29/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:12 PM]

#10

(#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert William Wazney. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 08/09/2019 05:07 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01256-HMH. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:12 AM]

#2

form(s) sent

#6

(#6) MOTION by Robert William Wazney to extend filing time for informal opening brief by 30 days. Date and method of service: 07/25/2019 US mail. [1000556064] [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:10 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: R. Wazney; W. Land. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:21 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert William Wazney. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 08/09/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • (#9) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Robert William Wazney. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 08/09/2019 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENTAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court record (paper) requested? N/A. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed [1000556069] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Informal Opening Brief and application to proceed in forma pauperis are due 08/29/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Robert William Wazney to extend filing time for informal opening brief by 30 days. Date and method of service: 07/25/2019 US mail. [1000556064] [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01256-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1737] TW [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: R. Wazney; W. Land. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Robert William Wazney - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/14/2019. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01256-HMH. Mailed to: R. Wazney. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01256-HMH. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-1737] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.