This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2021 at 06:13:51 (UTC).

Shannon McMinimee v. Yakima School District, et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Shannon McMinimee filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Yakima School District. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35297

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

YAKIMA SCHOOL DISTRICT, No. 7

JOHN R. IRION, in his individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHANNON MCMINIMEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jerry J. Moberg

Attorney at Moberg Rathbone Kearns, P.S.

P.O. Box 130, 124 3Rd Ave S.W.

Ephrata, WA 98823-2619

James E. Baker

Attorney at JERRY MOBERG & ASSOCIATES

451 Diamond Dr.

Ephrata, WA 98823

Patrick Ross Moberg

Attorney at Jerry Moberg & Associates

124 3Rd Ave Sw

Ephrata, WA 98823

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael B. Love Esquire

Attorney at Michael Love Law Firm, PLLC

905 W. Riverside, Suite 409

Spokane, WA 99201

Matthew Zachary Crotty Esquire

Attorney at Crotty & Son Law Firm, PLLC

905 West Riverside Avenue, Suite 409

Spokane, WA 99201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (MGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due August 30, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due September 29, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12135724]--[COURT UPADATE: Attached correct PDF of order. 06/07/2021 by SLM] (JPD) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:01 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL IN AssessmentConference, 06/03/2021, 2:30 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12088818] (LW) [Entered: 04/27/2021 02:41 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shannon McMinimee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12087799] [21-35297] (Crotty, Matthew) [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:53 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (MGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due August 30, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due September 29, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12135724]--[COURT UPADATE: Attached correct PDF of order. 06/07/2021 by SLM] (JPD) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL IN AssessmentConference, 06/03/2021, 2:30 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12088818] (LW) [Entered: 04/27/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12088490]. [21-35297] (AD) [Entered: 04/27/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shannon McMinimee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12087799] [21-35297] (Crotty, Matthew) [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Shannon McMinimee Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/27/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/20/2021. Transcript due 06/21/2021. Appellant Shannon McMinimee opening brief due 07/29/2021. Appellees John R. Irion and Yakima School District answering brief due 08/30/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12080844] (RT) [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Bradley Love

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW ZACHARY CROTTY