This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/28/2020 at 06:09:18 (UTC).

Shane Love v. Aaron Villacana, et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Shane Love filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Aaron Villacana. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56003

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL OROSCO, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

ROBERT GRIFFITH, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

CITY OF PASADENA

AARON VILLACANA, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

DOES, 1-10 inclusive

RAFAEL SANTIAGO, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

PEREZ, PPD Chief, individually and in official capacity

PHILLIP SANCHEZ, Former PPD Chief, individually and in official capacity

PHILLIP POIRIER, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

THOMAS BUTLER, Pasadena PD Officer, individually and in official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHANE LOVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Joseph Carpenter

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jill Williams Esquire

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michele Beal Bagneris Esquire

Attorney at Pasadena City Attorney's Office

100 North Garfield Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91109-7215

Steven Joseph Rothans

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Javan N. Rad

Attorney at Pasadena City Attorney's Office

100 North Garfield Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91109-7215

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Caree Annette Harper Esquire

4640 Admiralty Way

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Caree Harper

Attorney at Law Offices of Caree Harper

100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (SJS): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due December 28, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due January 27, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11892456] (AF) [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:51 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/12/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11878720] (CL) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:25 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/30/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11862221] (CL) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:18 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shane Love Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859184] [20-56003] (Harper, Caree) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:36 PM]

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11853053] (LW) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:10 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (SJS): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due December 28, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due January 27, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11892456] (AF) [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/12/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11878720] (CL) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/30/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11862221] (CL) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11859240]. [20-56003] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shane Love Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859184] [20-56003] (Harper, Caree) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11853053] (LW) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Shane Love Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/06/2020. Appellant Shane Love opening brief due 11/25/2020. Appellees Thomas Butler, City of Pasadena, Does, Robert Griffith, Michael Orosco, Perez, Phillip Poirier, Phillip Sanchez, Rafael Santiago and Aaron Villacana answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11840538] (JMR) [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caree Annette Harper Esquire