This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:05:00 (UTC).

Shane Harrington, et al v. Susan Strong, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Shane Harrington filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Susan Strong. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1498

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

H & S Club Omaha, Inc.

Shane Harrington

Meltech, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

Aimee Melton

Michelle Bang

John and Jane Doe, Nebraska State Patrol Officers #1-#800, In Their Individual Capacities and Official Capacities as Employees of the State of Nebraska

Colene Hinchy

Carol Blood

William Acosta-Trejo

Ken Kanger

Theresa Thibodeau

John and Jane Doe, Omaha Police Officers #1-#900, In Their Individual Capacities and Official Capacities as Employees of the City of Omaha Nebraska

Brenda Konfrst

Chris Jerram

The City of Omaha Nebraska

John Doe, Omaha Building Inspectors #1 and #2

Hobert B. Rupe

Doug Peterson

Robert Batt

Jean Stothert

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Evan Spencer

Attorney at SPENCER LAW FIRM

7Th Floor, 305 Broadway

New York, NY 10007

Travis Penn

Attorney at PENN LAW FIRM

319 S 17Th Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Peters

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 804, 1819 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68183-0000

Benjamin M. Goins

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

2115 State Capitol, P.O. Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-0000

Ryan Post

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

2115 State Capitol, P.O. Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4784049-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Travis Penn. Appellant brief of H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club due 05/31/2019. Appendix due on 05/31/2019. [4784183] [19-1498] (BNW) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:42 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4765913] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:16 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/31/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Travis Penn for Appellants H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Mr. Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club w/service 05/02/2019. [4784049] [19-1498] (TP) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:33 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/22/2019. Appendix due 05/02/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club due 05/02/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4765944] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:44 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order dated 01/29/2019, and Judgment dated 2/12/19. [4765926] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:29 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ryan S. Post for Appellees Mr. Robert Batt, Carol Blood, John A. Bolduc, Ms. Patty Pansing Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Mr. Doug Peterson, Mr. Pete Ricketts, Hobert B. Rupe, Ms. Susan I. Strong and Ms. Theresa Thibodeau w/service 03/13/2019 [4766109] [19-1498] (RP) [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:06 AM]

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent correcting case opening letter regarding fee status. [4769631] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 08:56 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michelle A. Peters for Appellees Jean Stothert, Todd Schmaderer, Mr. Ken Kanger, Ms. Michelle Bang, Ms. Colene Hinchy, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Chris Jerram, City of Omaha Nebraska, John and Jane Doe and Mr. John Doe w/service 03/14/2019 [4766632] [19-1498] (MP) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:31 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4784049-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Travis Penn. Appellant brief of H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club due 05/31/2019. Appendix due on 05/31/2019. [4784183] [19-1498] (BNW) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/31/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Travis Penn for Appellants H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Mr. Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club w/service 05/02/2019. [4784049] [19-1498] (TP) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent correcting case opening letter regarding fee status. [4769631] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michelle A. Peters for Appellees Jean Stothert, Todd Schmaderer, Mr. Ken Kanger, Ms. Michelle Bang, Ms. Colene Hinchy, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Chris Jerram, City of Omaha Nebraska, John and Jane Doe and Mr. John Doe w/service 03/14/2019 [4766632] [19-1498] (MP) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michelle A. Peters for Appellees Jean Stothert, Todd Schmaderer, Mr. Ken Kanger, Ms. Michelle Bang, Ms. Colene Hinchy, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton and Chris Jerram w/service 03/14/2019 [4766556] [19-1498] DOCUMENT LOCKED. Counsel will file a new appearance form listing all represented parties.--[Edited 03/14/2019 by AMT] (MP) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Ryan S. Post for Appellees Mr. Robert Batt, Carol Blood, John A. Bolduc, Ms. Patty Pansing Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Mr. Doug Peterson, Mr. Pete Ricketts, Hobert B. Rupe, Ms. Susan I. Strong and Ms. Theresa Thibodeau w/service 03/13/2019 [4766109] [19-1498] (RP) [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/22/2019. Appendix due 05/02/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, H & S Club Omaha, Inc., Shane Harrington, Meltech, Inc. and Midwest Girls Club due 05/02/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4765944] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order dated 01/29/2019, and Judgment dated 2/12/19. [4765926] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4765913] [19-1498] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.