This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 06:15:00 (UTC).

Shands Jacksonville Medical, et al v. Alex Azar, II

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Shands Jacksonville Medical filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex Azar, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5227

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., doing business as UFHealth Shands Hospital

San Joaquin Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/San Joaquin Community Hospital

Northeast Georgia Medical Center, 14cv503

Albany Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536

Westchester County Health Corporation, 14cv503

Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, doing business as Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, doing business as MemorialCare Long Beach Medical Center & MemorialCare Miller Children's and Women's Hospital Long Beach

AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital

Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound

AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center

Adirondack Health Services, Inc., 14-cv-536 ; 15-cv-01150, doing business as Glens Falls Hospital

Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., doing business as Metroplex Adventist Hospital, 15cv192

Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, 15cv192

Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601

American Hospital Association, 14cv607

Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Memorial Hospital of Burlington, doing business as Aurora Lakeland Medical Center, doing business as Aurora Medical Center - Kenosha, doing business as Aurora Medical Center

Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., doing business as Central Texas Medical Center, Florida Hospital Orlando, and Florida Hospital Heartland Medical Center, 15cv192

Delnor-Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Delnor Hospital

Plaintiff / Appellants

Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Dekalb Regional Medical Center

Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, 14cv1477, doing business as Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc

Lafayette General Medical Center, 15-cv-01800

151 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher L. Keough

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephanie A. Webster

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Robert L. Roth Esquire

Attorney at Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel John Hettich Esquire

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Mark Douglas Polston

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Dominic Francis Perella Esquire

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

Columbia Square, 555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lori Allison Rubin

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

3000 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5143

Donald H. Romano

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

3000 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5143

Other Attorneys

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas Gary Pulham

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1812123] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to amend the briefing schedule [ # 1811377-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 12/16/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/16/2020. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/23/2020. Final Briefs due 02/06/2020. [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1811377] to extend time to file brief to 12/16/2019 filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5087, 19-5227 [Service Date: 10/18/2019 ] Length Certification: 531 words. [19-5087, 19-5227] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:34 AM]

Open Document

SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1808708] filed by Adirondack Health Services, Inc., Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, AHMC Garfield Medical Center LP, AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, Ahmc Monterey Park Hospital LP, AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, AHMC Whittier Hospital Medical Center LP, Albany Memorial Hospital, Alegent Creighton Health, Alegent Creighton Health Creighton University Medical Center, LLC, Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health System, Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital Medical Center Lp, Allina Health System, Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc., Alton Memorial Hospital, American Hospital Association, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, Atlanticare Regional Medical Center, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc., Aurora Health Care North, Inc., Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., Aurora Medical Center Grafton, LLC, Aurora Medical Center Of Oshkosh, Inc., Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc., Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, Banner Health, Bay Area Medical Center, Inc., Baycare Aurora, LLC, Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, Carilion Medical Center, Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, Castle Medical Center, Central Dupage Hospital Association, Central Valley General Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Copley Memorial Hospital, Delnor-Community Hospital, Dignity Health, Einstein Healthcare Network, Emory-Adventist, Inc., Fayette Regional Health System, Feather River Hospital, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Greater New York Hospital Association, Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Hanford Community Hospital, Healthcare Association of New York, Henry Ford Health System, Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania, IHC Health Services, Inc., Jellico Community Hospital, Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, Lubbock County Hospital District, Martin Health System, Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Memorial Health Systems, Inc., Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., Memorial Hospital, Inc., Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., Midland County Hospital District, Mount Sinai Hospital, New Jersey Hospital Association, Northeast Georgia Medical Center, Oakbend Medical Center, Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., Physicians Medical Center, LLC, Portercare Adventist Health System, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Reedley Community Hospital, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, Riverside Medical Center, Rockwall Regional Center, LLC, Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC, Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, St. Helena Hospital, State University of Iowa, SwedishAmerican Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., Texas Health Huguley, Inc., Ukiah Adventist Hospital, University Community Hospital, Inc., University Medical Center At Lafayette, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center, Walla Walla General Hospital, West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., Westchester County Health Corporation, White Memorial Medical Center and Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1808707-2 ] [Service Date:09/30/2019 ] [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:39 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1808707] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center [Service Date: 09/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 11,500 words. [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:34 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1804115] filed consolidating cases 19-5227 (Consolidation started 08/28/2019) with 19-5087 [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:32 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1804112] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, MCSA, LLC, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5227. [19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1812123] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to amend the briefing schedule [ # 1811377-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 12/16/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/16/2020. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/23/2020. Final Briefs due 02/06/2020. [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION [1811377] to extend time to file brief to 12/16/2019 filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5087, 19-5227 [Service Date: 10/18/2019 ] Length Certification: 531 words. [19-5087, 19-5227] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1808708] filed by Adirondack Health Services, Inc., Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, AHMC Garfield Medical Center LP, AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, Ahmc Monterey Park Hospital LP, AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, AHMC Whittier Hospital Medical Center LP, Albany Memorial Hospital, Alegent Creighton Health, Alegent Creighton Health Creighton University Medical Center, LLC, Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health System, Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital Medical Center Lp, Allina Health System, Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc., Alton Memorial Hospital, American Hospital Association, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, Atlanticare Regional Medical Center, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc., Aurora Health Care North, Inc., Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., Aurora Medical Center Grafton, LLC, Aurora Medical Center Of Oshkosh, Inc., Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc., Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, Banner Health, Bay Area Medical Center, Inc., Baycare Aurora, LLC, Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, Carilion Medical Center, Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, Castle Medical Center, Central Dupage Hospital Association, Central Valley General Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Copley Memorial Hospital, Delnor-Community Hospital, Dignity Health, Einstein Healthcare Network, Emory-Adventist, Inc., Fayette Regional Health System, Feather River Hospital, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Greater New York Hospital Association, Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Hanford Community Hospital, Healthcare Association of New York, Henry Ford Health System, Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania, IHC Health Services, Inc., Jellico Community Hospital, Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, Lubbock County Hospital District, Martin Health System, Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Memorial Health Systems, Inc., Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., Memorial Hospital, Inc., Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., Midland County Hospital District, Mount Sinai Hospital, New Jersey Hospital Association, Northeast Georgia Medical Center, Oakbend Medical Center, Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., Physicians Medical Center, LLC, Portercare Adventist Health System, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Reedley Community Hospital, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, Riverside Medical Center, Rockwall Regional Center, LLC, Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC, Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, St. Helena Hospital, State University of Iowa, SwedishAmerican Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., Texas Health Huguley, Inc., Ukiah Adventist Hospital, University Community Hospital, Inc., University Medical Center At Lafayette, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center, Walla Walla General Hospital, West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., Westchester County Health Corporation, White Memorial Medical Center and Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1808707-2 ] [Service Date:09/30/2019 ] [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1808707] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center [Service Date: 09/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 11,500 words. [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1804401] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/30/2019. APPELLEES Brief(s) due on 10/30/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/20/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/27/2019. Final Briefs due 12/11/2019. [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1804115] filed consolidating cases 19-5227 (Consolidation started 08/28/2019) with 19-5087 [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1804112] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, MCSA, LLC, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5227. [19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHEAST GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, 15cv192 is a litigant