This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/28/2019 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Shands Jacksonville Medical, et al v. Alex Azar, II

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Shands Jacksonville Medical filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex Azar, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5085

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., doing business as UFHealth Shands Hospital

Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, 16-cv-01543

San Joaquin Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/San Joaquin Community Hospital

University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, 14cv976

Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, 14cv503

Northeast Georgia Medical Center, 14cv503

Albany Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536

Indian River Memorial Hospital, 16-cv-00032

Westchester County Health Corporation, 14cv503

Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, doing business as Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, doing business as MemorialCare Long Beach Medical Center & MemorialCare Miller Children's and Women's Hospital Long Beach

AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital

Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound

UH Regional Hospitals, 14cv976

AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center

Adirondack Health Services, Inc., 14-cv-536 ; 15-cv-01150, doing business as Glens Falls Hospital

Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital

American Legion Hospital, 15-cv-01800

Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601

Plaintiff / Appellant

Carilion Medical Center, 15cv192

152 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher L. Keough

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephanie A. Webster

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Lori Allison Rubin

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

3000 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5143

Robert L. Roth Esquire

Attorney at Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel John Hettich Esquire

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Mark Douglas Polston

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Other Attorneys

Dominic Francis Perella Esquire

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

Columbia Square, 555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas Gary Pulham

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Ex. A

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1788852] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: amended notice of appeal [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786321] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786317] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786316] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa and Northeast Georgia Medical Center in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc. and Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. in 19-5085, Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/05/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086]--[Edited 05/07/2019 by SHA] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786315] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786314] submitted by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1786313] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1786312] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786311] filed by Mark D. Polston and co-counsel Daniel John Hettich; Marisa Christina Maleck on behalf of Appellants Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Appellee Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, Appellants CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Appellee Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Appellee Henry Ford Health System and Appellants Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786300] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786297] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/05/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by SHA] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786296] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786294] submitted by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1786293] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC and Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1786286] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center and Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786283] filed by Lori A. Rubin on behalf of Appellees Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Appellants Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Appellees Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1782999] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Abby C. Wright on behalf of Appellee Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1781187] filed consolidating cases 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087 (Consolidation started 04/04/2019) with 19-5082. Directing appellants to file initial submissions: docketing statements, certificatesas to parties, statements of issues, underlying decision, joint deferred appendix statement, notices of appearance, transcript status reports, and procedural motions due 05/06/2019; dispositive motions due 05/20/2019. Directing appellee to file initial submissions: certificate as to parties, entry of appearance, and procedural motions due 05/06/2019; dispositive motions due 05/20/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 04/04/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1780782] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM filed by Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, Carilion Medical Center, Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., Emory-Adventist, Inc., Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., Henry Ford Health System, IHC Health Services, Inc., Jellico Community Hospital, Memorial Health Systems, Inc., Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., Memorial Hospital, Inc., Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., Pasco-pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., Portercare Adventist Health System D/b/a Porter Adventist Hospital, Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., Texas Health Huguley, Inc. and University Community Hospital, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5085. [19-5085] [Entered: 04/02/2019 08:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5085] [Entered: 04/02/2019 07:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound is a litigant

Latest cases where UH REGIONAL HOSPITALS is a litigant