This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/28/2021 at 12:01:16 (UTC).

Shands Jacksonville Medical, et al v. Alex Azar, II

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Shands Jacksonville Medical filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex Azar, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5082

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., doing business as UFHealth Shands Hospital

Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, 16-cv-01543

San Joaquin Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/San Joaquin Community Hospital

University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, 14cv976

Albany Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536

Indian River Memorial Hospital, 16-cv-00032

Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, doing business as Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, doing business as MemorialCare Long Beach Medical Center & MemorialCare Miller Children's and Women's Hospital Long Beach

AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital

Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound

UH Regional Hospitals, 14cv976

AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center

Adirondack Health Services, Inc., 14-cv-536 ; 15-cv-01150, doing business as Glens Falls Hospital

Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital

Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, 15cv192

American Legion Hospital, 15-cv-01800

Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601

Memorial Health Systems, Inc., 15cv192

Plaintiff / Appellants

Lubbock County Hospital District, 14cv503, doing business as University Medical Center

Board Of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, 14cv503, doing business as North Kansas City Hospital

Community Hospital of Brazosport, 14cv503, doing business as Brazosport Regional Health System

151 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher L. Keough

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephanie A. Webster

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Lori Allison Rubin

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

3000 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20007-5109

Robert L. Roth Esquire

Attorney at Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

Mark Douglas Polston

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Daniel John Hettich Esquire

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Other Attorneys

Dominic Francis Perella Esquire

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

Columbia Square, 555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas Gary Pulham

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #3

Exhibit B

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Stipulation Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketINCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--UNOPPOSED MOTION [1811352] to extend time to file brief to 12/16/2019 filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086 Length Certification: 531 words. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086]--[Edited 10/18/2019 by AH] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1799731] filed ORDERED that the Clerk note on the docket that Nos. 19-5082, 19-5085, and 19-5086 are dismissed. No mandate will issue. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of Nos. 19-5082, 19-5085, and 19-5086 with No. 19-5087 be terminated. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION [1796873] filed to dismiss case voluntarily [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 07/11/2019 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1793953] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants are limited to one joint response to the order to show cause for Nos. 19-5082, 19-5085, and 19-5086, and one response for No. 19-5087. Response to Order due 07/31/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1788852] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: amended notice of appeal [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1787759] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court - Amended Notice of Appeal [1787759-2] [19-5086] [Entered: 05/14/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786321] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786317] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786316] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa and Northeast Georgia Medical Center in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc. and Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. in 19-5085, Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/05/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086]--[Edited 05/07/2019 by SHA] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786315] filed by Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Oakbend Medical Center, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Midland County Hospital District, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Martin Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Riverside Medical Center, Westchester County Health Corporation, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Northeast Georgia Medical Center and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5082, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 19-5085, Henry Ford Health System and Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Physicians Medical Center, LLC and Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC in 19-5086 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086] (Polston, Mark) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786297] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/05/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by SHA] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786296] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786294] submitted by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1786293] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC and Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1786286] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center and Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786283] filed by Lori A. Rubin on behalf of Appellees Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, Memorial Hospital, Inc., National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, Appellants Affinity Hospital, LLC, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center and Appellees Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Bakersfield Heart Hospital and Memorial Hospital, Inc. in 19-5087. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1782999] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Abby C. Wright on behalf of Appellee Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1781187] filed consolidating cases 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087 (Consolidation started 04/04/2019) with 19-5082. Directing appellants to file initial submissions: docketing statements, certificatesas to parties, statements of issues, underlying decision, joint deferred appendix statement, notices of appearance, transcript status reports, and procedural motions due 05/06/2019; dispositive motions due 05/20/2019. Directing appellee to file initial submissions: certificate as to parties, entry of appearance, and procedural motions due 05/06/2019; dispositive motions due 05/20/2019. [19-5082, 19-5085, 19-5086, 19-5087] [Entered: 04/04/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1780590] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM filed by Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, Board Of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Copley Memorial Hospital, Fayette Regional Health System, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Lubbock County Hospital District, Martin Health System, Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Midland County Hospital District, Northeast Georgia Medical Center, Oakbend Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, Riverside Medical Center, State University of Iowa, SwedishAmerican Hospital, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and Westchester County Health Corporation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5082. [19-5082] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5082] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound is a litigant

Latest cases where UH REGIONAL HOSPITALS is a litigant