This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2021 at 21:06:46 (UTC).

Seyed Zia Ahmadi Abhari, et al v. Elias Nakhleh, et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Seyed Zia Ahmadi Abhari filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Elias Nakhleh. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56207

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, INC.

RICK PAK

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES, INC.

QIC US MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

TED CUTTING

UNITED BUSINESS BANK

CUTTING CONCEPTS CORPORATION

PREFERRED BANK

MUFG UNION BANK, N.A.

DOES, 1-10

Defendant / Appellees

MAZYAR YAGHOUBIAN

ELIAS NAKHLEH

VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, INC.

TNW BUSINESS BROKERS, INC.

DONNA GRADY

RICK PAK

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES, INC.

QIC US MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

MANINDER SINGH

TED CUTTING

UNITED BUSINESS BANK

MICHAEL NAKHLEH

SLATERS 50 50 FRANCHISE, LLC

CUTTING CONCEPTS CORPORATION

PREFERRED BANK

MUFG UNION BANK, N.A.

DOES, 1-10

Plaintiff / Appellants

NOUREEN ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

DONYA ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

SEYED ZIA EDDIN AHMADI ABHARI

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Vickie Grasu

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 1050

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Vickie V. Grasu Esquire

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 1050

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Allison Lenore Jones Esquire

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Kimberly D. Howatt Esquire

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kevin J. Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

1180 Rosecrans Street, Suite 104-552

San Diego, CA 92106

Marie Claire Mirch Esquire

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

1180 Rosecrans Street, Suite 104-552

San Diego, CA 92106

Christopher G. Weston

Attorney at Western Law Connection

9171 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Other Attorneys

Elizabeth Martori Weldon

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

William S. O'Hare Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Jing Hua

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): Plaintiffs-appellants motion for leave to file a supplemental brief to address the district courts January 25, 2021 order granting attorneys fees to appellee Rancho Mall, LLC (Docket Entry No. [ # 30 ]) is granted. Plaintiffs-appellants supplemental brief is due April 28, 2021. The answering briefs are due May 28, 2021. Appellants optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2 circuit advisory committee note. [12056731] (AF) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:03 PM]

#31

(#31) Filed (ECF) Appellees Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Elias Nakhleh and Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC response to motion ([ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file substitute or corrected brief). Date of service: 03/29/2021. [12056552] [20-56207] (Jones, Allison) [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:44 PM]

#30

(#30) Filed (ECF) Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Date of service: 03/17/2021. [12047852] [20-56207] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 3/19/2021 by TYL] (Weston, Christopher) [Entered: 03/19/2021 02:37 PM]

#29

(#29) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): Plaintiffs-appellants submitted their opening brief in this appeal on February 18, 2021. On February 19, 2021, plaintiffs-appellants filed an amended notice of appeal to include the district courts January 25, 2021 order granting attorneys fees to appellee Rancho Mall, LLC. To date, plaintiffs-appellants have not sought leave from this court to file an amended or replacement opening brief. Within 7 days after the date of this order, plaintiffs-appellants shall file a motion for leave to file an amended or replacement opening brief or a written statement that they do not intend to file such a motion. The established briefing schedule remains in effect. [12040047] (AF) [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:01 PM]

#24

(#24) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12021787] (RL) [Entered: 03/02/2021 02:09 PM]

#23

(#23) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12012982] (KWG) [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:40 AM]

#22

(#23) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12012982] (KWG) [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:40 AM]

#17

(#23) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12012982] (KWG) [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:40 AM]

#16

(#25) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 16 ] filed by Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch and Mirch Law Firm, LLP. [12023129] (SD) [Entered: 03/03/2021 02:11 PM]

#9

(#9) Streamlined request by Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLANTS. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch, Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11968854]--[COURT UPDATE: Attacdhed PDF. 01/20/2021 by SLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 06:20 PM]

#8

(#8) Streamlined request [6] by Appellants Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch and Mirch Law Firm, LLP to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLANTS. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch, Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11968849]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached PDF. 01/20/2021 by SLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 06:13 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11911460] (CL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:24 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/24/2020. [11905557] [20-56207] (Mirch, Marie) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:48 PM]

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): Plaintiffs-appellants motion for leave to file a supplemental brief to address the district courts January 25, 2021 order granting attorneys fees to appellee Rancho Mall, LLC (Docket Entry No. [ # 30 ]) is granted. Plaintiffs-appellants supplemental brief is due April 28, 2021. The answering briefs are due May 28, 2021. Appellants optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2 circuit advisory committee note. [12056731] (AF) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Filed (ECF) Appellees Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Elias Nakhleh and Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC response to motion ([ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file substitute or corrected brief). Date of service: 03/29/2021. [12056552] [20-56207] (Jones, Allison) [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Filed (ECF) Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Date of service: 03/17/2021. [12047852] [20-56207] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 3/19/2021 by TYL] (Weston, Christopher) [Entered: 03/19/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): Plaintiffs-appellants submitted their opening brief in this appeal on February 18, 2021. On February 19, 2021, plaintiffs-appellants filed an amended notice of appeal to include the district courts January 25, 2021 order granting attorneys fees to appellee Rancho Mall, LLC. To date, plaintiffs-appellants have not sought leave from this court to file an amended or replacement opening brief. Within 7 days after the date of this order, plaintiffs-appellants shall file a motion for leave to file an amended or replacement opening brief or a written statement that they do not intend to file such a motion. The established briefing schedule remains in effect. [12040047] (AF) [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#28) Streamlined request [27] by Appellees Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Elias Nakhleh and Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLEES. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Brookfield Properties, Inc., Ted Cutting, Cutting Concepts Corporation, Does, FranBizNetwork, Paul Koren, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Rick Pak, Christine Pham, Preferred Bank, QIC US Management Services, Inc., Queensland Investment Corporation, Rancho Mall, LLC, Bridget Smyth, United Business Bank, Victoria Gardens Corporation, Victory Park Capital Advisors, Inc., Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 04/21/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12031248] (DLM) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#27) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Elias Nakhleh and Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC. New requested due date is 04/21/2021. [12030972] [20-56207] (Howatt, Kimberly) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#26) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 14 ] in 5 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellants Kevin J. Mirch, et al. (4 copies of Vols 1-3 and 5; 3 copies of Vol 4 and Index Vol). [12024993] (LA) [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 16 ] filed by Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch and Mirch Law Firm, LLP. [12023129] (SD) [Entered: 03/03/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12021787] (RL) [Entered: 03/02/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12012982] (KWG) [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11969388] (RL) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Streamlined request by Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLANTS. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch, Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11968854]--[COURT UPDATE: Attacdhed PDF. 01/20/2021 by SLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [6] by Appellants Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch and Mirch Law Firm, LLP to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLANTS. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch, Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11968849]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached PDF. 01/20/2021 by SLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher G. Weston (Western Law Connection, Corp) for Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc., Mazyar Yaghoubian and Appellants Donya Entertainment, Inc., Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Kevin J. Mirch, Marie Claire Mirch and Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. Date of service: 01/19/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11968793] [20-56207] (Weston, Christopher) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Kevin J. Mirch and Marie Claire Mirch. New requested due date is 02/18/2021. [11968525] [20-56207] (Mirch, Marie) [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) COURT UPDATE: Entered appearance of Appellants Mirch Law Firm, LLP, Kevin J. Mirch and Marie Claire Mirch. [11968396] (TYL) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11911460] (CL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11905897]. [20-56207] (AD) [Entered: 11/24/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/24/2020. [11905557] [20-56207] (Mirch, Marie) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/24/2020. Appellants Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc. and Noureen Entertainment, Inc. opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees Bacon-Up Corporation, Capitol City Escrow, Inc., Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Donna Grady, JC and Associates, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, Maninder Singh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC, TNW Business Brokers, Inc. and Mazyar Yaghoubian answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11896226] (JBS) [Entered: 11/17/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED BUSINESS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC is a litigant