This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 06:04:17 (UTC).

Seth Navratil v. Menard, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Seth Navratil filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Menard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1659

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Menard, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Seth Navratil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel J. Gutman

Attorney at FRASER & STRYKER

500 Energy Plaza, 409 S. 17Th Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2663

Robert W. Futhey

Attorney at FRASER & STRYKER

500 Energy Plaza, 409 S. 17Th Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2663

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

F. Matthew Aerni

Attorney at BERRY LAW FIRM

6940 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68510

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/26/2020- SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4915570-1] [20-1659] (AMT) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:32 PM]

Open Document

Second Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/20/2020. [4913765-1] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:33 AM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Seth Navratil, w/service 05/14/2020. Length: 3,183 words. Brief of Menard, Inc. due on 06/15/2020. [4913499] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:06 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. [4912746] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:19 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil, w/service 05/07/2020. [4910759] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:20 AM]

Open Document

Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/12/2020. [4910747-1] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:06 AM]

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. [4910745] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:02 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Erik William Fern for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil correcting [ # 4898669-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney. [4898754] [20-1659] (EWF) [Entered: 04/03/2020 08:56 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Erik William Fern for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil correcting [ # 4898669-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney. [4898754] [20-1659] (EWF) [Entered: 04/03/2020 08:56 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil w/service 03/30/2020 [4897056] [20-1659] (FA) [Entered: 03/30/2020 03:10 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Menard, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4897003] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Daniel J. Gutman for Appellee Menard, Inc. w/service 03/30/2020 [4897002] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Robert W. Futhey for Appellee Menard, Inc. w/service 03/30/2020 [4896996] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:37 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/06/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Seth Navratil due 05/06/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4896645] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:36 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order dated 2/28/2020. [4896643] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:33 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4896640] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:29 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecord Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/26/2020- SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4915570-1] [20-1659] (AMT) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/20/2020. [4913765-1] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Seth Navratil, w/service 05/14/2020. Length: 3,183 words. Brief of Menard, Inc. due on 06/15/2020. [4913499] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Mr. Seth Navratil submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4913488] [20-1659] (FA) [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. [4912746] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Mr. Seth Navratil submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4912700] [20-1659] (FA) [Entered: 05/12/2020 07:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil, w/service 05/07/2020. [4910759] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecord Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. Record Deficiency due on 05/12/2020. [4910747-1] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil. [4910745] [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Seth Navratil. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4910616] [20-1659] (FA) [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Erik William Fern for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil correcting [ # 4898669-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney. [4898754] [20-1659] (EWF) [Entered: 04/03/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to withdraw as counsel, [ # 4898669-2 ], submitted by Mr. Erik William Fern in 20-1659, pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion. [20-1659] (HAG) [Entered: 04/02/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Mr. Erik William Fern for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil w/service 04/02/2020. [4898669] [20-1659] (EWF) [Entered: 04/02/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by F. Matthew Aerni for Appellant Mr. Seth Navratil w/service 03/30/2020 [4897056] [20-1659] (FA) [Entered: 03/30/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Menard, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4897003] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel J. Gutman for Appellee Menard, Inc. w/service 03/30/2020 [4897002] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robert W. Futhey for Appellee Menard, Inc. w/service 03/30/2020 [4896996] [20-1659] (RWF) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/06/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Seth Navratil due 05/06/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4896645] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order dated 2/28/2020. [4896643] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4896640] [20-1659] (CMH) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Menard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank M. Aerni