This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2019 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

Service Pump & Supply v. Sun Industries, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Service Pump Supply filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sun Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1891

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

SUN INDUSTRIES, LLC

TOBY BERTHELOT

Plaintiff / Appellee

SERVICE PUMP & SUPPLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James Earl Simon

Attorney at SPILMAN, THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC

Spilman Center, 300 Kanawha Boulevard, East, P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Gerald Morton Titus III

Attorney at SPILMAN, THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC

Spilman Center, 300 Kanawha Boulevard, East, P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paul T. Farrell Jr.

Attorney at GREENE KETCHUM FARRELL BAILEY & TWEEL

419 11Th Street, P. O. Box 2389

Huntington, WV 25724-2389

Clayton J. Maddox

Attorney at GREENE KETCHUM FARRELL BAILEY & TWEEL

419 11Th Street, P. O. Box 2389

Huntington, WV 25724-2389

Clayton James Maddox

Attorney at GREENE KETCHUM FARRELL BAILEY & TWEEL

419 11Th Street, P. O. Box 2389

Huntington, WV 25724-2389

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Volume II

15 #1

APPENDIX (electronic & paper form)

#14

(#14) BRIEF by Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/09/2019. [1000604051] [19-1891] Gerald Titus [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:30 PM]

#13

(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1891] MRB [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:55 AM]

11 #2

Transcript order

11 #1

Transcript order acknowledgment

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Toby Berthelot. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577428] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:05 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sun Industries, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577426] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:04 PM]

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#7

(#7) Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gerald M. Titus III for Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC. [1000571292] [19-1891] Gerald Titus [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:43 AM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James E. Simon for Sun Industries, LLC and Toby Berthelot. [1000571283] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:33 AM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Service Pump & Supply. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000571251] [19-1891] Clayton Maddox [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:12 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Clayton J Maddox. for Service Pump & Supply. [1000571248] [19-1891] Clayton Maddox [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:10 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00976. Mailed to: Maddox and Farrell. [19-1891] AW [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:30 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 15 ] by Toby Berthelot. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [2]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [715]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 10/09/2019. [1000605000] [19-1891] AW [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 14 ] by Toby Berthelot. Number of pages: [35]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 10/06/2019. [1000604995] [19-1891] AW [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 10/09/2019. [1000604059] [19-1891] Gerald Titus [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF by Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/09/2019. [1000604051] [19-1891] Gerald Titus [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1891] MRB [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/09/2019. Response Brief due 11/08/2019 [19-1891] AW [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Kathy L. Swinhart. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 05/20/2019 Pretrial Conference. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Sun Industries, LLC and Toby Berthelot. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00976. Transcript due from Kathy L. Swinhart, Official Court Reporter on 11/04/2019. [19-1891] AW [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Toby Berthelot. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577428] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sun Industries, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577426] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC. [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gerald M. Titus III for Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC. [1000571292] [19-1891] Gerald Titus [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gerald M. Titus III for Toby Berthelot and Sun Industries, LLC. [1000571285] [19-1891]--[Edited 08/21/2019 by AW--see correction at ECF #7] Gerald Titus [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James E. Simon for Sun Industries, LLC and Toby Berthelot. [1000571283] [19-1891] James Simon [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Service Pump & Supply. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000571251] [19-1891] Clayton Maddox [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Clayton J Maddox. for Service Pump & Supply. [1000571248] [19-1891] Clayton Maddox [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00976. Mailed to: Maddox and Farrell. [19-1891] AW [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00976. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1891] AW [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul T. Farrell, Jr.