This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:19 (UTC).

Sergio Fiorarancio v. Zwicker & Associates, P.C., et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Sergio Fiorarancio filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Zwicker Associates, P C . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2569

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SERGIO D. FIORARANCIO, individually and on behalf of those similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Philip D. Stern Esq.

Attorney at Stern Thomasson

150 Morris Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Yongmoon Kim Esq.

Attorney at Kim Law Firm

411 Hackensack Avenue, Suite 701

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Andrew T. Thomasson Esq.

Attorney at Stern Thomasson

150 Morris Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Francis R. Greene

Attorney at Stern Thomasson

150 Morris Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mitchell L. Williamson Esq.

Attorney at Barron & Newburger

458 Elizabeth Avenue, Suite 5371

Somerset, NJ 08873

Raymond A. Garcia Esq.

Attorney at Stroock Stroock & Lavan

180 Maiden Lane, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond A. Garcia on behalf of Appellee(s) Zwicker & Associates, P.C.. [19-2569] (RAG) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fioraracio. [19-2569] (YK) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:06 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, received. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:48 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, filed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:00 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:45 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, filed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:38 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Francis R. Greene on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fiorarancio. [19-2569] (FRG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:33 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Philip D. Stern on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fiorarancio. [19-2569] (PDS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:30 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew T. Thomasson on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fioraracio. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:24 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Zwicker & Associates PC, filed. [19-2569] (MLW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:15 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mitchell L. Williamson, Esq, Barron & Newburger, P.C. on behalf of Appellee(s) Zwicker & Associates, P.C.. [19-2569] (MLW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:10 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Yongmoon Kim, Esq., Phillip S. Stenger, Esq., Andrew T. Thomasson, Esq., Mitchell L Williamson, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:35 AM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #3

DC Letter opinion 6/7/19

Open Document #2

DC Order 6/6/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond A. Garcia on behalf of Appellee(s) Zwicker & Associates, P.C.. [19-2569] (RAG) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fioraracio. [19-2569] (YK) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, received. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, filed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio, filed. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Francis R. Greene on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fiorarancio. [19-2569] (FRG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Philip D. Stern on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fiorarancio. [19-2569] (PDS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew T. Thomasson on behalf of Appellant(s) Sergio D. Fioraracio. [19-2569] (ATT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Zwicker & Associates PC, filed. [19-2569] (MLW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mitchell L. Williamson, Esq, Barron & Newburger, P.C. on behalf of Appellee(s) Zwicker & Associates, P.C.. [19-2569] (MLW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Yongmoon Kim, Esq., Phillip S. Stenger, Esq., Andrew T. Thomasson, Esq., Mitchell L Williamson, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Sergio D. Fiorarancio in District Court No. 2-18-cv-12793. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less