This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 06:50:01 (UTC).

Sergio Cota v. Fresenius USA, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Sergio Cota filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fresenius USA, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55303

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SERGIO COTA, individually; and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

FRESENIUS USA, INC., a Massachusetts corporation

FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., a Delaware corporation

DOES, 1 through 100 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas Stephen Campbell

Attorney at Rastegar Law Group, APC

22760 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 200

Torrance, CA 90505

Farzad Rastegar Esquire

Attorney at Rastegar Law Group, APC

22760 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 200

Torrance, CA 90505

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Hugh Stern Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Alex Edwin Spjute Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sergio Cota Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/29/2022. [12407473] [22-55303] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 03/29/2022 12:02 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/18/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12412416] (VS) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:47 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12444704] (CL) [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:28 PM]

#6

(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/26/2022. [12457295] [22-55303]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 06/01/2022 by LA] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:54 PM]

#7

(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/26/2022. [12457298] [22-55303]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 06/01/2022 by LA] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:56 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by Sergio Cota is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by Sergio Cota are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12461216] (LA) [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:24 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#14) Streamlined request [13] by Appellees Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. and Fresenius USA, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Does, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. and Fresenius USA, Inc. answering brief due 07/27/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12476313] (DLM) [Entered: 06/21/2022 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. and Fresenius USA, Inc.. New requested due date is 07/27/2022. [12474920] [22-55303] (Spjute, Alex) [Entered: 06/20/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 7 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Sergio Cota. [12466828] (SD) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 6 ] filed by Sergio Cota. [12466823] (SD) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by Sergio Cota is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by Sergio Cota are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12461216] (LA) [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/31/2022. [12459759] [22-55303] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/31/2022 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 6 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/31/2022. [12459755] [22-55303] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/31/2022 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/26/2022. [12457298] [22-55303]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 06/01/2022 by LA] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Sergio Cota. Date of service: 05/26/2022. [12457295] [22-55303]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 06/01/2022 by LA] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12444704] (CL) [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/18/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12412416] (VS) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/29/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12407512]. [22-55303] (AD) [Entered: 03/29/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sergio Cota Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/29/2022. [12407473] [22-55303] (Campbell, Thomas) [Entered: 03/29/2022 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sergio Cota Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/01/2022. Appellant Sergio Cota opening brief due 05/26/2022. Appellees Does, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. and Fresenius USA, Inc. answering brief due 06/27/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12405268] (RT) [Entered: 03/25/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Edwin Spjute

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David H. Stern