This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/29/2021 at 06:06:50 (UTC).

Sequoia Technology, LLC v. Super Micro Computer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Sequoia Technology, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Super Micro Computer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2266

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SEQUOIA TECHNOLOGY, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

SUPER MICRO COMPUTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Brauerman Esq.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrei Iancu

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Alan J. Heinrich

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Philip J. Warrick

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

750 17Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#7

(#7) CORRECTED ORDER: Correcting Clerk Order to consolidate appeals [3],Clerk Order [3]; reason(s): to reflect correct short title. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798816] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:21 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC in 21-2265, Entry of Appearance [ # 798573-2 ], [ # 798572-2 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 798574-2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798613] [21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:47 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Andrei Iancu; Alan Heinrich; Philip Warrick as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/01/2021 by email. [796787] [21-2266] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:36 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/10/2021 by email. [798575] [21-2266] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/10/2021 06:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED ORDER: Correcting Clerk Order to consolidate appeals [3],Clerk Order [3]; reason(s): to reflect correct short title. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798816] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC in 21-2265, Entry of Appearance [ # 798573-2 ], [ # 798572-2 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 798574-2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798613] [21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/10/2021 by email. [798575] [21-2266] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/10/2021 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2263 Lead with 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267 Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [797266] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER consolidating appeals (21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267). Appellants' opening brief is due no later than October 29, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [797259] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Andrei Iancu; Alan Heinrich; Philip Warrick as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/01/2021 by email. [796787] [21-2266] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/26/2021. [796081] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/13/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/13/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/13/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 10/29/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/30/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sequoia Technology, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Super Micro Computer, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Blumenfeld