This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2021 at 06:06:33 (UTC).

Sequoia Technology, LLC v. Dell, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Sequoia Technology, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dell, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2263

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED HAT, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

SEQUOIA TECHNOLOGY, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

DELL, INC.

DELL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

EMC CORPORATION, aka Dell EMC

HEWLETT-PACKARD ENTERPRISE CO.

HITACHI VANTARA CORPORATION

SUPER MICRO COMPUTER, INC.

HITACHI LTD.

INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellant

ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Brauerman Esq.

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrei Iancu

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Alan J. Heinrich

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John E. Lord

4000 Macarthur Boulevard

Newport Beach, CA 92660

William J. O'Brien

9301 Wilshire Boulevard, Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Philip J. Warrick

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

750 17Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeremy A. Tigan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Christopher Decoro

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Todd M. Friedman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, Citigroup Center

New York, NY 10022

Hersh H. Mehta

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

71 South Wacker Drive, 16Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Brian P. Egan Esq.

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION of Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC to extend the time to 12/13/2021 to file brief, to extend the time to file brief. Service: 10/11/2021 by email. [804755] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 10/11/2021 09:29 PM]

#17

(#17) Corrected Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn; Todd M. Friedman; Christopher DeCoro; Hersh H. Mehta as counsel for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/17/2021 by email. [800194] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/17/2021 09:40 AM]

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/21/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [799181] [JCW] [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:42 PM]

#15

(#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798928] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:44 PM]

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798927] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:42 PM]

#13

(#13) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798925] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:24 PM]

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798924] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:21 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn; Todd M. Friedman; Christopher DeCoro; Hersh H. Mehta as counsel for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798923] [21-2263] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 16 ] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:19 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798908] [21-2263] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/13/2021 05:50 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798876] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:06 PM]

#8

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798876] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:06 PM]

#7

(#7) CORRECTED ORDER: Correcting Clerk Order to consolidate appeals [3],Clerk Order [3]; reason(s): to reflect correct short title. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798816] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:21 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/20/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798615] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:57 AM]

#5

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/20/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798615] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:57 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Andrei Iancu; Alan Heinrich; Philip Warrick as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/01/2021 by email. [796784] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:20 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 18 ] filed by Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/13/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [804823] [JCW] [Entered: 10/12/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 18 ] filed by Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/13/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [804820] [JCW] [Entered: 10/12/2021 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION of Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC to extend the time to 12/13/2021 to file brief, to extend the time to file brief. Service: 10/11/2021 by email. [804755] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 10/11/2021 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corrected Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn; Todd M. Friedman; Christopher DeCoro; Hersh H. Mehta as counsel for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/17/2021 by email. [800194] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/17/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/21/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [799181] [JCW] [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798928] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798927] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798925] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798924] [21-2263] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn; Todd M. Friedman; Christopher DeCoro; Hersh H. Mehta as counsel for Appellees Dell Technologies Inc., Dell, Inc., EMC Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Enterprise Co., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Vantara Corporation, IBM, Red Hat, Inc. and Super Micro Computer, Inc.. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798923] [21-2263] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 16 ] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798908] [21-2263] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/13/2021 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute and Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798876] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellants Sequoia Technology, LLC and Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798871] [21-2263] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED ORDER: Correcting Clerk Order to consolidate appeals [3],Clerk Order [3]; reason(s): to reflect correct short title. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798816] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/20/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [798615] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for John E. Lord; William J. O'Brien as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/10/2021 by email. [798571] [21-2263] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [John Lord] [Entered: 09/10/2021 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2263 Lead with 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267 Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [797266] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER consolidating appeals (21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267). Appellants' opening brief is due no later than October 29, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [797259] [21-2263, 21-2264, 21-2265, 21-2266, 21-2267] [JCW] [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Andrei Iancu; Alan Heinrich; Philip Warrick as counsel for Appellant Sequoia Technology, LLC. Service: 09/01/2021 by email. [796784] [21-2263] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/26/2021. [796066] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/13/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/13/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/13/2021. Appellant's brief is due 10/29/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/30/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sequoia Technology, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Hat, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Super Micro Computer, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hitachi Vantara Corporation is a litigant