This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:02 (UTC).

Sepideh Cirino, et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Sepideh Cirino filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55817

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CIRINO FAMILY TRUST, an Irrevocable Trust (plaintiff in pro se personally as well as trustee for the Cirino Family Trust)

Defendant / Appellees

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING, Any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs tittle, or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC

WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., as Trustee for holders of IMPAC Secured Assets Corp. Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-4

Plaintiff / Appellant

SEPIDEH CIRINO, an individual

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gary E. Devlin Esquire

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Daniel Sanchez-Behar

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sepideh Cirino

27495 Hidden Trail Road

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) Streamlined request by Appellant Sepideh Cirino to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Sepideh Cirino opening brief due 10/15/2019. Appellees All Persons Unknown Claiming, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Western Progressive, LLC answering brief due 11/14/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11417490] (DLM) [Entered: 08/30/2019 04:31 PM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Streamlined request by Appellant Sepideh Cirino to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Sepideh Cirino opening brief due 10/15/2019. Appellees All Persons Unknown Claiming, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Western Progressive, LLC answering brief due 11/14/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11417490] (DLM) [Entered: 08/30/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#3) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Sanchez-Behar for party(s) Appellee Western Progressive, LLC Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, in case 19-55817. [11382847] (RR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Sanchez-Behar (HINSHAW & CULBERTSON, LLP, 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 800, Los Angeles, CA 90025) for Appellees Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Western Progressive, LLC. Date of service: 07/31/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11382681] [19-55817] (Sanchez-Behar, Daniel) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sepideh Cirino opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellees All Persons Unknown Claiming, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Western Progressive, LLC answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11365606] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.