This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 06:07:08 (UTC).

Semiconductor Components Indus v. Power Integrations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Semiconductor Components Indus filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Power Integrations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16936

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.

Not Classified By Court

In re: APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1782 OF SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS INDUSTRIES, LLC

Petitioner / Appellant

SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS INDUSTRIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Michael R. Headley

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

500 Arguello Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Howard G. Pollack

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

500 Arguello Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Colette Reiner Mayer

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

755 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1018

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11482624] (WL) [Entered: 10/30/2019 07:42 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/25/2019. [11478208] [19-16936] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:05 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/30/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11465415] (VS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 08:56 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2019. [11459423] [19-16936] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:13 PM]

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire Instructions

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #2

Mediaiton Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11482624] (WL) [Entered: 10/30/2019 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/25/2019. [11478208] [19-16936] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/30/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11465415] (VS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11460117][19-16936] (AD) [Entered: 10/09/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2019. [11459423] [19-16936] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#7) Added Attorney(s) Howard G. Pollack for party(s) Appellee Power Integrations, Inc., in case 19-16936. [11452175] (JFF) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Howard G. Pollack (Fish & Richardson P.C., 500 Arguello Street, Suite 500, Redwood City, CA 94063) for Appellee Power Integrations, Inc.. Date of service: 10/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11452138] [19-16936] (Pollack, Howard) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#5) Added Attorney(s) Michael R. Headley for party(s) Appellee Power Integrations, Inc., in case 19-16936. [11452059] (JFF) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael R. Headley (Fish & Richardson P.C., 500 Arguello Street, Suite 500, Redwood City, CA 94063) for Appellee Power Integrations, Inc.. Date of service: 10/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11451951] [19-16936] (Headley, Michael) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#3) Added Attorney(s) Deanne Maynard for party(s) Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, in case 19-16936. [11451703] (JFF) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Date of service: 10/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11451378] [19-16936] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/02/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/09/2019. Appellant Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellee Power Integrations, Inc. answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11451185] (RT) [Entered: 10/02/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colette Reiner Mayer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deanne E. Maynard