This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/17/2021 at 06:27:07 (UTC).

Selane Products, Inc. v. Continental Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Selane Products, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Continental Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55123

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SELANE PRODUCTS, INC., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE ASSOCIATION

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kirk Pasich

Attorney at Pasich LLP

10880 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael Stephen Gehrt Esquire

Attorney at Pasich LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 690

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Jay L. T. Breakstone

Attorney at Parker Waichman LLP

6 Harbor Park Drive

Port Washington, NY 11050

Shaun Hamilton Crosner

Attorney at Pasich LLP

10880 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Jacquelyn Mohr

Attorney at Pasich LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 690

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Raymond C. Silverman

Attorney at Parker Waichman LLP

6 Harbor Park Drive

Port Washington, NY 11050

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Geoffrey David Godwin

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Thomas Lloyd

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel H. Levi

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Brian M. Lipshutz

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Aimee Woodward Brown Esquire

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

H. Christopher Boehning

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Melanie Cockrum

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Laura Foggan Esquire

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#41

#40

#38

#37

#36

#34

#33

#29

#28

#26

#25

20 #5

Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice

20 #4

Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice

20 #3

Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice

20 #2

Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice

20 #1

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief

#19

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#44) This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San Francisco Please review the San Francisco sitting dates for August 2021 and the 2 subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please file # Form 32 within 3 business days of this notice using the CM/ECF filing type Response to Case Being Considered for Oral Argument . Please follow the form's # instructions carefully. When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 business days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[12075403]. [21-55123] (KS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 38 ] filed by American Property Casualty Insurance Association and National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies. [12068531] (SD) [Entered: 04/08/2021 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Received 6 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 37 ] filed by Selane Products, Inc.. [12065451] (SD) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 38 ] submitted by American Property Casualty Insurance Association and National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12063916] (LA) [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 37 ] submitted by Selane Products, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12063912] (LA) [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#39) Entered appearance of Amici Curiae American Property Casualty Insurance Association and National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies. [12063910] (LA) [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by American Property Casualty Insurance Association; National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12062411] [21-55123] (Foggan, Laura) [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Selane Products, Inc.. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12062295] [21-55123] (Crosner, Shaun) [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC):This case will be calendared between August 11-13, 2021. Counsel may need to make themselves available at any time during this time frame. [12061303] (OC) [Entered: 04/01/2021 05:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 29 ] filed by Continental Casualty Company. [12060033] (SD) [Entered: 03/31/2021 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kannon K. Shanmugam (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP - 2001 K Street NW, Washington, DC, 20006) for Appellee Continental Casualty Company. Date of service: 02/25/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12016199] [21-55123] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 02/25/2021 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Raymond C. Silverman for party(s) Appellant Selane Products, Inc., in case 21-55123. [12015811] (RR) [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Raymond Charles Silverman (Parker Waichman LLP, 6 Harbor Park Drive, Port Washington, NY 11050) for Appellant Selane Products, Inc.. Date of service: 02/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12014938] [21-55123] (Silverman, Raymond) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Jacquelyn Mohr for party(s) Appellant Selane Products, Inc., in case 21-55123. [12014893] (RR) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jacquelyn Michelle Mohr (Pasich LLP - 1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 690, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266) for Appellant Selane Products, Inc.. Date of service: 02/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12014669] [21-55123] (Mohr, Jacquelyn) [Entered: 02/24/2021 09:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/23/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12014442]. [21-55123] (AD) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Selane Products, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/23/2021. [12014292] [21-55123] (Crosner, Shaun) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Thomas Lloyd for party(s) Appellee Continental Casualty Company, in case 21-55123. [12013714] (RR) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas Joseph Lloyd (Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP 275 Battery Street, Suite 2600 San Francisco, CA 94111) for Appellee Continental Casualty Company. Date of service: 02/23/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12013556] [21-55123] (Lloyd, Thomas) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Selane Products, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/23/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/15/2021. Transcript due 04/13/2021. Appellant Selane Products, Inc. opening brief due 05/24/2021. Appellee Continental Casualty Company answering brief due 06/24/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12004694] (RT) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less