This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2020 at 06:05:07 (UTC).

Seidemann v. Professional Staff Congress Lo

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Seidemann filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Professional Staff Congress Lo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-460

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellees

Faculty Association of Suffolk County Community College

United University Professions, Farmingdale State College Chapter

Plaintiff / Appellants

Bruce Martin, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

David Seidemann, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

American Federation of Teachers AFL-CIO

American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations

New York State United Teachers

Professional Staff Congress Local 2334

National Education Association of the United States

American Association of University Professors Collective Bargaining Congress

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Appellee Attorneys

Michael James Del Piano Esq.

Attorney at New York State United Teachers

52 Broadway

Newyork, NY 10004

Edward J. Greene Esq. Jr.

Attorney at New York State United Teachers

800 Troy-Schenectady Road

Latham, NY 12110

Andrea Ashley Wanner Esq.

Attorney at New York State United Teachers

800 Troy-Schenectady Road

Latham, NY 12110

Hanan B. Kolko

Attorney at Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP

900 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Irwin Bluestein Esq.

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Charles Moerdler Esq.

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Dina Kolker Esq.

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Arthur Justin Herskowitz

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Alan Mark Klinger Esq.

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Kent Y. Hirozawa Esq.

Attorney at Gladstein, Reif & Meginniss, LLP

39 Broadway

New York, NY 10006

David M. Slutsky Esq.

Attorney at Levy Ratner, P.C.

80 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10011

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gregory N. Longworth Esq.

Attorney at Clark Hill, PLC

200 Ottawa Avenue, Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

John J. Bursch Esq.

Attorney at Bursch Law PLLC

9339 Cherry Valley, Se

Caledonia, MI 49316

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) MOTION, to remove appeal from the expedited calendar, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2797927] [20-460]--[Edited 03/10/2020 by JB] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:18 PM]

#65

(#65) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2797794] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:17 AM]

#64

(#64) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [63], on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED.[2797702] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:33 AM]

#61

(#61) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 04/08/2020, appellee's brief due date as 05/13/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2793391] [20-460] [Entered: 03/04/2020 03:25 PM]

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Education Association of the United States, FILED. Service date 02/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2781307] [20-460] [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:06 AM]

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

1 #2

Case FILED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann Brief due date as 06/10/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 06/10/2020, FILED.[2806542] [20-460] [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, informing Court of proposed due date 06/10/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2806427] [20-460] [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for for the removal of this appeal from the Courts Expedited Appeals Calendar, Appellants shall file a scheduling notification letter within 14 days of the date of this order [ # 68 ], filed by Appellant David Seidemann and Bruce Martin, by RKW, FILED. [2799301][72] [20-460] [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MOTION, to remove appeal from the expedited calendar, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2797927] [20-460]--[Edited 03/10/2020 by JB] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ATTORNEY, John J. Bursch for David Seidemann Bruce Martin, in case 20-460 , [ # 65 ], ADDED.[2797883] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 65 ], on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED.[2797877] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2797794] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [63], on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED.[2797702] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2797656] [20-460] [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 04/08/2020, appellee's brief due date as 05/13/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2793391] [20-460] [Entered: 03/04/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Education Association of the United States, FILED. Service date 02/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2781307] [20-460] [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, FILED. Service date 02/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2780729] [20-460] [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 02/18/2020 by email.[2780362] [20-460] [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. Service date 02/18/2020 by email.[2780356] [20-460] [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Mr. Irwin Bluestein, Esq. for Appellee American Federation of Teachers AFL-CIO and Professional Staff Congress Local 2334, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2771628] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2771596] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18698084, FILED.[2771595] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2771592] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2771590] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Martin and David Seidemann, FILED. [2771584] [20-460] [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less