This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 06:03:22 (UTC).

Security People, Inc. v. Iancu

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Security People, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Iancu. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2118

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Plaintiff / Appellant

SECURITY PEOPLE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Scott R. McIntosh

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Leif Eric Overvold

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Frear Stephen Schmid Esq.

177 Post Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

Frear Stephen Schmid

Attorney at Frear Stephen Schmid, Attorney at Law

177 Post Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION of Appellant Security People, Inc. to extend the time to 11/08/2019 to file the September 9, 2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633103] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:13 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Scott R. McIntosh as of counsel for Appellees Iancu and PATO. Service: 08/29/2019 by email. [632073] [19-2118] [Scott McIntosh] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:57 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees PATO and Iancu. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626852] [19-2118] [Leif Overvold] [Entered: 08/07/2019 06:27 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626535] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:42 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Frear Stephen Schmid as principal counsel for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625489] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:23 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625488] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:41 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Security People, Inc., Entry of Appearance - F. Stephen Schmid; Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 08/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624412] [JAL] [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:51 AM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Leif Overvold as principal counsel for Appellees Iancu and PATO. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [623949] [19-2118] [Leif Overvold] [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:18 AM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623750] [19-2118] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:48 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Frear Stephen Schmid as principal counsel for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623749] [19-2118] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:44 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant Security People, Inc. The opening brief is due 11/08/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [633147] [JAL] [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION of Appellant Security People, Inc. to extend the time to 11/08/2019 to file the September 9, 2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633103] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Scott R. McIntosh as of counsel for Appellees Iancu and PATO. Service: 08/29/2019 by email. [632073] [19-2118] [Scott McIntosh] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#10) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [632048] [JAL] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees PATO and Iancu. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626852] [19-2118] [Leif Overvold] [Entered: 08/07/2019 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626535] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Frear Stephen Schmid as principal counsel for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625489] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625488] [19-2118] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Security People, Inc., Entry of Appearance - F. Stephen Schmid; Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 08/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624412] [JAL] [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Leif Overvold as principal counsel for Appellees Iancu and PATO. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [623949] [19-2118] [Leif Overvold] [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623750] [19-2118] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Frear Stephen Schmid as principal counsel for Appellant Security People, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623749] [19-2118] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Frear Schmid] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/09/2019. [619943] Entry of Appearance is due 07/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/24/2019. Docketing Statement is due 08/09/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/09/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frear Stephen Schmid