This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/21/2022 at 06:20:10 (UTC).

Securities & Exchange Commissi v. Illarramendi

Case Summary

On 12/02/2014 Securities Exchange Commissi filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Illarramendi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-4471

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fractal Fund Management, Ltd.

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Fractal P Holding, Ltd.

Rowberrow Trading Corp.

Appellant

Ramon Illarramendi

Defendant

Francisco Illarramendi

Appellee

John J. Carney, Esq.

Defendant / Appellees

Highview Point Offshore, LTD.

MK Energy and Infrastructure, LLC

Michael Kenwood Asset Management, LLC

Highview Point LP

Michael Kenwood Capital Management, LLC

Highview Point Partners, LLC

MKEI Solar, LP

Highview Point Master Fund, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Colin Hagan Esq.

Attorney at Shlansky Law Group, LLP

1 Winnisimmet Street

Chelsea, MA 02150

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Brian New Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Marc Edward Hirschfield Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#79

75 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

75 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

75 #1

Summary Order FILED

#74

#70

#69

68 #2

Notice_to_the_BAR

68 #1

Calendar_Notice (Hearing)

12 #4

Exhibit B to Addenda A & B

12 #1

Form C FILED

#11

#10

#9

#7

#3

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1685162] [14-4471] [Entered: 01/15/2016 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the district court judgment, by DAL, CFD, C.JJ., Stein, D.J., FILED.[1648251] [14-4471] [Entered: 11/23/2015 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1648234] [14-4471] [Entered: 11/23/2015 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Docket(#72) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Theresa Blaber, TRANSMITTED.[1612774] [14-4471] [Entered: 10/05/2015 12:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Docket(#71) CASE, before DAL, CFD, C.JJ., Stein, D.J., HEARD.[1609621] [14-4471] [Entered: 09/30/2015 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Ramon Illarramendi, FILED. Service date 09/25/2015 by CM/ECF. [1607288] [14-4471] [Entered: 09/25/2015 04:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Highview Point LP, Highview Point Master Fund, LTD., Highview Point Offshore, LTD., Highview Point Partners, LLC, Michael Kenwood Asset Management, LLC, Michael Kenwood Capital Management, LLC, MK Energy and Infrastructure, LLC and MKEI Solar, LP, FILED. Service date 07/29/2015 by CM/ECF. [1564646] [14-4471] [Entered: 07/29/2015 10:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1562724] [14-4471] [Entered: 07/27/2015 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Docket(#67) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/30/2015, B Panel, SET.[1560580] [14-4471] [Entered: 07/23/2015 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Docket(#66) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/28/2015, B, PROPOSED.[1537730] [14-4471] [Entered: 06/22/2015 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1392122] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/12/2014 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ramon Illarramendi, FILED. Service date 12/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1390752] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 10:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ramon Illarramendi, FILED. Service date 12/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1390751] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 10:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John J. Carney and -- Michael Kenwood Capital Management, LLC, Michael Kenwood Asset Management, LLC, MK Energy and Infrastructure, LLC, MKEI Solar, LP and Highview Point Partners, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1390649] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John J. Carney, FILED. Service date 12/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1390622] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY, Jonathan B. New, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Dennis O. Cohen, SUBSTITUTED.[1390581] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John J. Carney and -- Michael Kenwood Capital Management, LLC, Michael Kenwood Asset Management, LLC, MK Energy and Infrastructure, LLC, MKEI Solar, LP and Highview Point Partners, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1390017] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/10/2014 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER GRANTING THE RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN AND INITIAL DISTRIBUTION, dated 10/27/2014, RECEIVED.[1385689] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/05/2014 10:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ramon Illarramendi, district court receipt # 0205-3435054, FILED.[1385682] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/05/2014 10:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ramon Illarramendi, FILED. [1385676] [14-4471] [Entered: 12/05/2014 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less