Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 06:58:32 (UTC).

Securities & Exchange Commissi v. Illarramendi

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 Securities Exchange Commissi filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Illarramendi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-2551

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fractal Fund Management, Ltd.

Fractal P Holding, Ltd.

Rowberrow Trading Corp.

Defendants

Highview Point Master Fund, LTD.

Highview Point LP

Michael Kenwood Capital Management, LLC

Highview Point Offshore, LTD.

Highview Point Partners, LLC

Michael Kenwood Asset Management, LLC

MKEI Solar, LP

MK Energy and Infrastructure, LLC

Appellee

John J. Carney

Defendant / Appellant

Francisco Illarramendi

Fairton, NJ 08320

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Jonathan Brian New Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Francisco Illarramendi

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

P.O. Box 420

Fairton, NJ 08320

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Sarah Ribstein Prins Esq.

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2104350] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:28 PM]

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Sarah Prins, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Michael A. Conley, SUBSTITUTED.[2104328] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:19 PM]

#170

(#95) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/17/2019, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 18-9224, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[2589070] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/18/2019 12:02 PM]

#169

(#94) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 05/10/2019, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 18-9224, RECEIVED.[2564663] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:55 PM]

#168

(#93) JUDGMENT MANDATE, copy to pro se, ISSUED.[2326805] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/18/2018 12:21 PM]

#167

(#92) ORDER, a petition for panel rehearing, or, in the alternative, for rehearing en banc denied, copy to pro se, FILED.[2322051] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/11/2018 12:09 PM]

#164

(#89) PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Illarramendi in 17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551, FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by US mail.[2299277] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 05/09/2018 04:29 PM]

162 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

162 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

162 #1

Summary Order FILED

#161

(#86) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2284257] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 04/20/2018 09:37 AM]

#74

(#12) ORDER, dated 09/07/2017, dismissing appeal by 9/28/2017, unless Appellant Francisco Illarramendi, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2119176] [17-2551] [Entered: 09/07/2017 02:42 PM]

#67

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2103955] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:36 AM]

66 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

66 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#65

(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING ON MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, dated 07/20/2017, RECEIVED.[2103947] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:34 AM]

64 #2

Case FILED

64 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/17/2019, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 18-9224, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[2589070] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/18/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 05/10/2019, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 18-9224, RECEIVED.[2564663] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) JUDGMENT MANDATE, copy to pro se, ISSUED.[2326805] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/18/2018 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER, a petition for panel rehearing, or, in the alternative, for rehearing en banc denied, copy to pro se, FILED.[2322051] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 06/11/2018 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Illarramendi in 17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551, FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by US mail.[2299277] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 05/09/2018 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the judgment and the order of the district court, by BDP, RR, DAL, copy to pro se, FILED.[2284263] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 04/20/2018 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2284257] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 04/20/2018 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Docket(#84) CASE, to BDP, RR, DAL, SUBMITTED.[2275554] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 04/10/2018 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2254749] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 03/12/2018 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay [ # 74 ] filed by Appellant Francisco Illarramendi in 17-1506, FILED. [2249666][80] [17-1506, 17-1893, 17-2551] [Entered: 03/05/2018 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Illarramendi, FILED. Service date 09/02/2017 by US mail.[2120677] [17-2551] [Entered: 09/08/2017 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 09/07/2017, dismissing appeal by 9/28/2017, unless Appellant Francisco Illarramendi, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2119176] [17-2551] [Entered: 09/07/2017 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2104350] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Sarah Prins, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Michael A. Conley, SUBSTITUTED.[2104328] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2104039] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Docket(#6) NOTE: See lead case, 17-1506, containing complete set of docket entries.[2103962] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2103955] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2103952] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING ON MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, dated 07/20/2017, RECEIVED.[2103947] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Illarramendi, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED. [2103942] [17-2551] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowberrow Trading Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where MKEI Solar, LP is a litigant