This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/07/2022 at 06:09:36 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Penn

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Penn. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1262

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendants

Michael St. Altura Ewers

The Camelot Group International, LLC

SSecurion, LLC

A Bighouse Photography and Film Studio, LLC

Camelot Acquisitions Secondary Opportunities Management, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Intervenor

New York County District Attorney's Office

Defendant / Appellant

Lawrence E. Penn, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Matro Esq.

Daniel Staroselsky Esq.

Intervenor Attorney

Stephen Joseph Kress

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Lawrence E. Penn III

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ] filed by Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, by RSP, RJL, WJN, FILED. [3343267][41] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 10:01 AM]

40 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

40 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

40 #1

Summary Order FILED

#39

(#39) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3343238] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 09:42 AM]

#35

(#35) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 06/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3340161][35] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/29/2022 01:49 PM]

#34

(#34) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter with Evidence of Mailing and Hand Delivery of the Defendant-Appellant Penn Response in Opposition to SEC Motion to consolidate this appeal with case No. 21-1348cv and in Opposition to summarily disposing of this appeal consistent with this case., on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/28/2022 by CM/ECF, hand delivery, US mail.[3339593] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:49 PM]

#30

(#30) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/28/2022 by CM/ECF, hand delivery, US mail. [3338904] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/28/2022 12:09 AM]

#28

(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, opposition, [27], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED.[3337498] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/24/2022 08:45 AM]

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#21

(#27) OPPOSITION TO , to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3337482] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/24/2022 12:02 AM]

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [15], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED.[3330820] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:35 PM]

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Daniel Staroselsky for United States Securities and Exchange Commission, in case 22-1262 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3330407] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:48 AM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#43) CAPTION, in light of Summary Order dated 07/07/2022, AMENDED.[3343322] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 10:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ] filed by Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, by RSP, RJL, WJN, FILED. [3343267][41] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, dismissing appeal, by RSP, RJL, WJN, FILED.[3343261] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3343238] [22-1262] [Entered: 07/07/2022 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 06/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3340161][35] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/29/2022 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter with Evidence of Mailing and Hand Delivery of the Defendant-Appellant Penn Response in Opposition to SEC Motion to consolidate this appeal with case No. 21-1348cv and in Opposition to summarily disposing of this appeal consistent with this case., on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/28/2022 by CM/ECF, hand delivery, US mail.[3339593] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CURED DEFECTIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND SUMMARILY DISPOSE OF THIS APPEAL CONSISTENT WITH THE COURTS RULING IN 21-1348 [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED.[3338989] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/28/2022 09:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/28/2022 by CM/ECF, hand delivery, US mail. [3338904] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/28/2022 12:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) OPPOSITION TO , to consolidate appeals [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3337482] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/24/2022 12:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, opposition, [27], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED.[3337498] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/24/2022 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/10/2022 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[3330985] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 05:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [15], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED.[3330820] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. Service date 06/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3330770] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Daniel Staroselsky for United States Securities and Exchange Commission, in case 22-1262 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3330407] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States Securities and Exchange Commission, FILED. Service date 06/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3330403] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3330402] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3330396] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#6) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, district court receipt # 1090, FILED.[3330394] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/03/2022, RECEIVED.[3330373] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Lawrence E. Penn, III, FILED. [3330365] [22-1262] [Entered: 06/10/2022 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less