This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/12/2022 at 06:08:39 (UTC).

SEC v. Team Resources

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Team Resources. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10359

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant / Appellants

Team Resources Incorporated

Fossil Energy Corporation

Kevin A. Boyles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nikolay V. Vydashenko

Attorney at U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Cherry Street, Burnett Plaza

Fort Worth, TX 76102-6882

Daniel Staroselsky

Attorney at U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission

100 F Street, N.E.

Washington, DC 20549

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jacob Shaye Frenkel Esq.

Attorney at Dickinson Wright, P.L.L.C.

1825 Eye Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated [22-10359] (MFY) [Entered: 04/13/2022 02:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10359] (Daniel Staroselsky ) [Entered: 04/13/2022 07:48 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9827756-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/05/2022 for Appellants Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated [22-10359] (LEF) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:24 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Team Resources Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 06/02/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Frenkel; Attorney for Appellee: Staroselsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Vydashenko. [22-10359] (Jacob Shaye Frenkel ) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:11 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/18/2022 for Appellants Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated. [22-10359] (DDL) [Entered: 06/07/2022 11:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/18/2022 for Appellants Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated. [22-10359] (DDL) [Entered: 06/07/2022 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10359] (DDL) [Entered: 06/07/2022 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:15-CV-1045. Electronic ROA due on 06/17/2022. [22-10359] (LEF) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Team Resources Incorporated, Mr. Kevin A. Boyles and Fossil Energy Corporation advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-10359] (LEF) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Team Resources Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 06/02/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Frenkel; Attorney for Appellee: Staroselsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Vydashenko. [22-10359] (Jacob Shaye Frenkel ) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9827756-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/05/2022 for Appellants Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated [22-10359] (LEF) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel Staroselsky for party(s) Appellee SEC, in case 22-10359 [22-10359] (LEF) [Entered: 04/19/2022 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10359] (Daniel Staroselsky ) [Entered: 04/13/2022 07:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Kevin A. Boyles, Fossil Energy Corporation and Team Resources Incorporated [22-10359] (MFY) [Entered: 04/13/2022 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Shaye Frenkel