This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/20/2021 at 06:05:58 (UTC).

SEC v. Sethi

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Sethi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40564

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

American National Bank of Texas

Appellee

Marcus Helt

Plaintiff / Appellee

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant / Appellant

Sameer P. Sethi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Huttenbach

Appellee Attorneys

Brantley Smith

Stacy R. Obenhaus

Thomas Scannell

Michael E. Haynes

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Matro

Matthew John Gulde

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Sameer P. Sethi

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Received & Returned

Open Document #2

Special Letter

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [9654242-2] [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/26/2021 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Jan Mason. [21-40564] (Jan Mason ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 08:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Sameer P. Sethi advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Sameer P. Sethi and returned because form is incompleteTranscript Order deadline updated to 09/01/2021 for Appellant Sameer P. Sethi [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel Matro for party(s) Appellee SEC, in case 21-40564 [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/17/2021 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40564] (Daniel Matro ) [Entered: 08/16/2021 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brantley Smith, Thomas Scannell, Stacy R. Obenhaus for party(s) Appellee Marcus Helt, in case 21-40564 [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40564] (Thomas Scannell ) [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40564] (Brantley Smith ) [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40564] (Stacy R. Obenhaus ) [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9635854-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/20/2021 for Appellant Sameer P. Sethi. Transcript order due on 08/20/2021 for Appellant Sameer P. Sethi [21-40564] (SDH) [Entered: 08/05/2021 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Sameer P. Sethi in 21-40564. Update: appellant lower party type updated. [21-40564] (ABT) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sameer P. Sethi [21-40564] (ABT) [Entered: 07/22/2021 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less