This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/24/2021 at 06:07:49 (UTC).

SEC v. Mark Johnson

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Mark Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1711

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendants

KEVIN DROST

WALTZER

OWINGS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

THE OWINGS GROUP, LLC

OWINGS CAPITAL FUNDS, LLC

OWINGS-1, LLC

ONE SOURCE ADVISORS, LLC

BRIAN KOSLOW

MJSC ENTERPRISES LLC

STRATEGIC COACHING, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendant / Appellant

MARK JOHNSON

Lutherville, MD 21093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Daniel Staroselsky

Attorney at UNITED STATES SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

William Stuart Heyman

Attorney at HEYMAN LAW FIRM

201 North Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #2

Disclosure form

10 #1

Follow up

9 #2

Transcript order

9 #1

Transcript order acknowledgment

#8

#7

#6

#4

3 #2

Disclosure form

3 #1

Informal briefing order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/08/2021. Response Brief due 10/08/2021 [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/30/2021 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Johnson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000990235] [21-1711] William Heyman [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Mark Johnson. [21-1711] William Heyman [Entered: 07/21/2021 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02046-RDB. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William S. Heyman for Mark Johnson. [1000988191] [21-1711] William Heyman [Entered: 07/19/2021 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Mark Johnson re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Johnson. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/19/2021 08:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Ronda J. Thomas. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Telephonic Motions Hearing 05/05/2021. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Mark Johnson. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02046-RDB. Transcript due from Ronda J. Thomas, Official Court Reporter on 09/14/2021. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/09/2021 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed suspending briefing. Copies to all parties. [1000983280] [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/09/2021 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Mark Johnson for. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 07/09/2021 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel Staroselsky for SEC. [1000980534] [21-1711] Daniel Staroselsky [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02046-RDB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 06/30/2021 08:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/09/2021. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Johnson. Informal Opening Brief due 07/19/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Mark Johnson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 07/26/2021 Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02046-RDB. Mailed to: Johnson. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02046-RDB. Case manager: AWalker. [21-1711] AW [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Stuart Heyman