This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:25:28 (UTC).

SEC v. Mahabub, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Mahabub. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1455

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

GENAUDIO INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendant / Appellant

TAJ JERRY MAHABUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael Patrick McCloskey

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

401 West A Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Leslie Hughes

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

1961 Stout Street, Suite 1700

Denver, CO 80294-1961

Emily True Parise

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Andrew Bryan Holmes

Attorney at Holmes, Taylor, Cowan & Jones

617 South Olive Street, The Oviatt Building

Los Angeles, CA 90014

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10709167] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/12/2020 for Andrew Bryan Holmes. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:02 AM]

Open Document

[10709224] Notice received from Taj Jerry Mahabub that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 10:07 AM]

Open Document

[10709059] Entry of appearance filed by Andrew Bryan Holmes for Taj Jerry Mahabub. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:37 PM]

Open Document

[10706308] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellant has not filed the required preliminary documents. Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due on 01/10/2020 for Taj Jerry Mahabub. Failure to comply with this order will likely result in dismissal of this appeal without further notice. Served on 12/31/2019. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:28 AM]

Open Document

[10703428] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no preliminary documents have been filed by Appellant. Transcript order form, docketing statement, and notice of appearance due on 12/30/2019 for Taj Jerry Mahabub. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/18/2019 07:19 AM]

Open Document

[10701300] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Emily True Parise for SEC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y( Two of the parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10709842] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court sua sponte for case management purposes. These appeals shall be procedurally consolidated as follows for the purposes of briefing, submission to the court, and oral argument, if scheduled. The Appellants, shall file, to the extent practicable, file a single consolidated opening brief and appendix on or before 02/24/2020. The SEC shall file a single consolidated answer brief, and the appellants shall file a single consolidated reply brief. See attached order for further details. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:15 PM]

Open Document

[10709049] Docketing statement filed by Taj Jerry Mahabub in 19-1455. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455, 19-1454] ABH [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:30 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10710026] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/23/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/15/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709842] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court sua sponte for case management purposes. These appeals shall be procedurally consolidated as follows for the purposes of briefing, submission to the court, and oral argument, if scheduled. The Appellants, shall file, to the extent practicable, file a single consolidated opening brief and appendix on or before 02/24/2020. The SEC shall file a single consolidated answer brief, and the appellants shall file a single consolidated reply brief. See attached order for further details. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket[10709217] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/13/2020. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709167] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/12/2020 for Andrew Bryan Holmes. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket[10709098] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/21/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 07:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709224] Notice received from Taj Jerry Mahabub that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/13/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709059] Entry of appearance filed by Andrew Bryan Holmes for Taj Jerry Mahabub. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455] [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709049] Docketing statement filed by Taj Jerry Mahabub in 19-1455. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455, 19-1454] ABH [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket[10709047] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew B. Holmes for Appellant Taj Jerry Mahabub in 19-1455 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 01/10/2020 by LAB to remove from related case and remove pdf from entry as pleading was filed 1/10/2020.] [19-1455] ABH [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706308] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellant has not filed the required preliminary documents. Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due on 01/10/2020 for Taj Jerry Mahabub. Failure to comply with this order will likely result in dismissal of this appeal without further notice. Served on 12/31/2019. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703428] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no preliminary documents have been filed by Appellant. Transcript order form, docketing statement, and notice of appearance due on 12/30/2019 for Taj Jerry Mahabub. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/18/2019 07:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket[10701391] Entry of appearance submitted by David J. Aveni for Not Party David J. Aveni in 19-1454, 19-1455 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454, 19-1455]--[Edited 12/20/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/11/2019] DJA [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10701300] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Emily True Parise for SEC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y( Two of the parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket[10701283] Entry of appearance submitted by Emily True Parise for Appellee SEC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455] --[Edited 12/10/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/10/2019.] ETP [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10698918] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/29/2019. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 12/16/2019 for Taj Jerry Mahabub. Notice of appearance due on 12/16/2019 for Taj Jerry Mahabub and Securities and Exchange Commission. [19-1455] [Entered: 12/02/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.