This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:08:17 (UTC).

SEC v. GenAudio Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against GenAudio Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1454

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

TAJ JERRY MAHABUB

Defendant / Appellant

GENAUDIO INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Bryan Holmes

Attorney at Holmes, Taylor, Cowan & Jones

617 South Olive Street, The Oviatt Building

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Patrick McCloskey

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

401 West A Street

San Diego, CA 92101

David Joseph Aveni

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

401 West A Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Leslie Hughes

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

1961 Stout Street, Suite 1700

Denver, CO 80294-1961

Emily True Parise

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10709842] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court sua sponte for case management purposes. These appeals shall be procedurally consolidated as follows for the purposes of briefing, submission to the court, and oral argument, if scheduled. The Appellants, shall file, to the extent practicable, file a single consolidated opening brief and appendix on or before 02/24/2020. The SEC shall file a single consolidated answer brief, and the appellants shall file a single consolidated reply brief. See attached order for further details. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:15 PM]

Open Document

[10709049] Docketing statement filed by Taj Jerry Mahabub in 19-1455. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455, 19-1454] ABH [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:30 PM]

Open Document

[10703875] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by GenAudio Inc.. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] DJA [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:05 AM]

Open Document

[10703803] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Transcript order due 12/30/2019 for GenAudio Inc.. [19-1454] [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:13 AM]

Open Document

[10701409] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Joseph Aveni for GenAudio Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1454] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:43 AM]

Open Document

[10701416] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Patrick McCloskey for GenAudio Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:54 AM]

Open Document

[10701392] Docketing statement filed by GenAudio Inc.. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] MPM [Entered: 12/10/2019 07:18 PM]

Open Document

[10701306] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Emily True Parise for SEC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1454] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:38 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10710026] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/23/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/15/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10709842] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court sua sponte for case management purposes. These appeals shall be procedurally consolidated as follows for the purposes of briefing, submission to the court, and oral argument, if scheduled. The Appellants, shall file, to the extent practicable, file a single consolidated opening brief and appendix on or before 02/24/2020. The SEC shall file a single consolidated answer brief, and the appellants shall file a single consolidated reply brief. See attached order for further details. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-1454, 19-1455] [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10709049] Docketing statement filed by Taj Jerry Mahabub in 19-1455. Served on 01/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-1455, 19-1454] ABH [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • [10704248] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/20/2019. [19-1454] [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • [10703914] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/26/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1454] [Entered: 12/19/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703875] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by GenAudio Inc.. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] DJA [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703803] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Transcript order due 12/30/2019 for GenAudio Inc.. [19-1454] [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701409] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Joseph Aveni for GenAudio Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1454] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701416] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Patrick McCloskey for GenAudio Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701393] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael P. McCloskey for Appellant GenAudio Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 12/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1454] MPM [Entered: 12/10/2019 07:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701392] Docketing statement filed by GenAudio Inc.. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454] MPM [Entered: 12/10/2019 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701391] Entry of appearance submitted by David J. Aveni for Not Party David J. Aveni in 19-1454, 19-1455 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454, 19-1455]--[Edited 12/20/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/11/2019] DJA [Entered: 12/10/2019 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701306] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Emily True Parise for SEC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1454] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701281] Entry of appearance submitted by Emily True Parise for Appellee SEC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1454]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/10/2019] ETP [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698412] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/27/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 12/11/2019 for GenAudio Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 12/11/2019 for Securities and Exchange Commission [19-1454] [Entered: 11/27/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.