This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/17/2023 at 06:08:02 (UTC).

SEC v. Barton

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 SEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Barton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11132

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant / Appellant

Timothy Barton

Amicus Curiae

Cortney Christopher Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ezekiel Levenson Hill

Keefe Michael Bernstein

David B. Reece

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael J. Edney

Michael Christopher Dingman

Edwin A. Huffman

Richard Bratton Roper Esq. III

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Charlene Cantrell Koonce

Cortney Christopher Thomas

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/09/2023 for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Timothy Barton. Date of service: 01/10/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Koonce, Thomas; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Reece [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 01/10/2023 11:34 PM]

#50

(#50) RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton. Date of service: 01/10/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill, Reece; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Koonce, Thomas [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:55 PM]

46 #2

Court Order

46 #1

MOT-2 Letter

40 #2

Court Order

40 #1

MOT-2 Letter

33 #3

Appendix in Support of Receiver's Response to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

33 #2

Real Party In Interest Receiver's Brief in Response to Motion for Stay Pending A

33 #1

Motion to Intervene

#30

(#30) COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ] Response/Opposition due by NOON, Thursday, on 01/05/2023. [22-11132] (WMJ) [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:51 PM]

#20

(#30) COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ] Response/Opposition due by NOON, Thursday, on 01/05/2023. [22-11132] (WMJ) [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:51 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11132] (Edwin A. Huffman ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:28 AM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11132] (Michael Christopher Dingman ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:25 AM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael J. Edney for Mr. Timothy Barton for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:14 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11132] (Ezekiel Levenson Hill ) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:37 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/10/2023 for Appellant Timothy Barton. [22-11132] (DDL) [Entered: 12/01/2022 12:55 PM]

Open Document

(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 11/18/2022 04:10 PM]

Open Document

(#1) US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [22-11132] (AS) [Entered: 11/18/2022 10:37 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/09/2023 for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Timothy Barton. Date of service: 01/10/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Koonce, Thomas; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Reece [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 01/10/2023 11:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton. Date of service: 01/10/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill, Reece; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Koonce, Thomas [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 01/10/2023 10:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Docket(#48) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ms. Cortney C. Thomas for Amicus Curiae Cortney Christopher Thomas in 22-11132 [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 01/10/2023 07:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#47) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charlene Cantrell Koonce for Amicus Curiae Cortney Christopher Thomas in 22-11132 [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 01/09/2023 04:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) COURT ORDER denying Motion to stay the district court's order appointing a Receiver, pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [ # 20 ]; denying alternative Motion to stay several components of that order and others that have become part of it, pending appeal, filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [ # 20 ] [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 01/06/2023 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) COURT ORDER denying Motion to intervene filed by Mr. Cortney Christopher Thomas [ # 33 ] filed by; denying as moot Motion for leave to file a response filed by Mr. Cortney Christopher Thomas [ # 33 ]; granting Motion to file amicus brief filed by Mr. Cortney Christopher Thomas [ # 33 ] filed by Cortney Christopher Thomas in 22-11132; granting Motion to file amicus brief in excess of word count filed by Mr. Cortney Christopher Thomas [ # 33 ] [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 01/06/2023 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [34] to the Court Order Court directive requesting a response [ # 30 ], Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by SEC [34] to the filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [ # 20 ], filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [ # 20 ] Date of Service: 01/05/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill, Reece; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper. [22-11132] (Ezekiel Levenson Hill ) [Entered: 01/05/2023 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OPPOSED MOTION to intervene filed by Cortney Christopher Thomas in support of Plaintiff, for leave to file a response [33] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], to file amicus brief [33], [33] [22-11132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION by Charlene C. Koonce to intervene , on behalf of Cortney C. Thomas, Receiver. Date of service: 01/05/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernstein, Hill, Reece; Attorney for Appellants: Dingman, Edney, Huffman, Roper [22-11132] (Charlene Cantrell Koonce ) [Entered: 01/05/2023 09:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton in 22-11132 [ # 20 ] Response/Opposition due by NOON, Thursday, on 01/05/2023. [22-11132] (WMJ) [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11132] (Cortney Christopher Thomas ) [Entered: 12/29/2022 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11132] (Edwin A. Huffman ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11132] (Michael Christopher Dingman ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael J. Edney for Mr. Timothy Barton for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11132] (Michael J. Edney ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 11:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ezekiel Levenson Hill for party(s) Appellee SEC, in case 22-11132 [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 12/05/2022 08:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11132] (Ezekiel Levenson Hill ) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/10/2023 for Appellant Timothy Barton. [22-11132] (DDL) [Entered: 12/01/2022 12:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-11132] (DDL) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:22-CV-2118. Electronic ROA due on 12/05/2022. [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 11/18/2022 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-11132] (MFY) [Entered: 11/18/2022 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy Barton [22-11132] (AS) [Entered: 11/18/2022 10:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less